This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:08:09 (UTC).

Zook v. W&W Energy Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 Zook filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against W W Energy Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Robert A. Junell and Judge David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:15-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert A. Junell

Referral Judge

Judge David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Zook

Defendant

W&W Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Matthew Scott Parmet

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Ste. 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

David Isaac Moulton

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey F. Thomason

Attorney at Todd, Barron,Thomason & Hudman, P.C.

3800 East 42Nd St., Suite 409

Odessa, TX 79762-5982

 

Court Documents

#17

No Description Available

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7640766), filed by Brandon Zook. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Brandon Zook. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandon Zook. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to W&W Energy Services, Inc. (aej) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Jeffrey F. Thomason added to party W&W Energy Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by W&W Energy Services, Inc..(Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by W&W Energy Services, Inc.. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case by W&W Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue)(Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Transfer Case to Midland Division. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rf) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 7/25/2016 01:00 PM in Default hearing location for Midland before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth, Jury Trial set for 7/25/2016 01:00 PM before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/16/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2016, Discovery due by 5/16/2016, Motions due by 5/26/2016,. Signed by Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. (lg1) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert A. Junell for all proceedings. Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. (lg1) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#12

(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Counts. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2016 05:00 PM before Judge Robert A. Junell,). Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#15

(#15) ORDER RESETTING, ( Bench Trial reset for 8/2/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Robert A. Junell,). Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet on behalf of Brandon Zook. Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet added to party Brandon Zook(pty:pla) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

17 #2

Appendix Proposed Notice, Email & Script

17 #1

Exhibit A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Certify Class and Send Notice to Putative Class Members by Brandon Zook. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix Proposed Notice, Email & Script, # 3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David Counts. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet on behalf of Brandon Zook. Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet added to party Brandon Zook(pty:pla) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER RESETTING, ( Bench Trial reset for 8/2/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Robert A. Junell,). Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2016 05:00 PM before Judge Robert A. Junell,). Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by W&W Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Counts. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert A. Junell for all proceedings. Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. (lg1) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 7/25/2016 01:00 PM in Default hearing location for Midland before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth, Jury Trial set for 7/25/2016 01:00 PM before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/16/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2016, Discovery due by 5/16/2016, Motions due by 5/26/2016,. Signed by Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. (lg1) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Transfer Case to Midland Division. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rf) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Transfer Case by W&W Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue)(Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by W&W Energy Services, Inc.. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Jeffrey F. Thomason added to party W&W Energy Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by W&W Energy Services, Inc..(Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to W&W Energy Services, Inc. (aej) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandon Zook. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Brandon Zook. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7640766), filed by Brandon Zook. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W & W Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey F. Thomason