This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:15:18 (UTC).

Zond, LLC v. Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2014 Zond, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-12438

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zond, LLC

Defendants

TSMC North America Corp.

Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited

Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.

Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Radulescu

Attorney at Radulescu LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6910

New York, NY 10118

Etai Lahav

Attorney at Radulescu LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6910

New York, NY 10118

Maria Granovsky

Attorney at Radulescu LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6910

New York, NY 10018

Michael D. Sadowitz

Attorney at Radulescu LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6910

New York, NY 10118

Tigran Vardanian

Attorney at Radulescu LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6910

New York, NY 10118

David S. Godkin

Attorney at Birnbaum & Godkin, LLP

280 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

Ashok Ramani

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Benjamin Berkowitz

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Charles E. Ewing

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David C. Dotson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

David J. Rosen

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeffrey R. Chanin

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew C. Gaudet

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Quyen Ta

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Richard C. Kim

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

750 B Street, Suite 2900

San Diego, CA 92101-4681

Robert Terry Parker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110

Thomas E. Gorman

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jayson L. Cohen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Karen L. Hagberg

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5047299 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Zond, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zond, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc., Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited, TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed TSMC North America Corp. served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#97

(#97) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey R. Chanin, Ashok Ramani, Quyen Ta and Benjamin Berkowitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#98

(#98) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rebekah L. Punak, Charles Elijah Ewing, Thomas E. Gorman and David J. Rosen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#99

(#99) Joint MOTION to Stay by Zond, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahav, Etai) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#100

(#100) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: This case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of any party re 99 Joint MOTION to Stay (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#101

(#101) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR CLOSURE (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#102

(#102) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the TSMC Defendants by TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

#103

(#103) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the TSMC Defendants by TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#104

(#104) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Fujitsu Defendants by Zond, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#105

(#105) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: SO ORDERED re 104 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Zond, LLC (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: SO ORDERED re 104 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Zond, LLC (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Fujitsu Defendants by Zond, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the TSMC Defendants by TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the TSMC Defendants by TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR CLOSURE (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: This case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of any party re 99 Joint MOTION to Stay (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Joint MOTION to Stay by Zond, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahav, Etai) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rebekah L. Punak, Charles Elijah Ewing, Thomas E. Gorman and David J. Rosen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey R. Chanin, Ashok Ramani, Quyen Ta and Benjamin Berkowitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rebekah L. Punak, Charles Elijah Ewing, Thomas E. Gorman and David J. Rosen Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5326613 by TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited.(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Merton E. Thompson on behalf of Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc., Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited (Thompson, Merton) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed TSMC North America Corp. served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc., Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited, TSMC North America Corp., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zond, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5047299 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Zond, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Godkin, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where TSMC North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maria Granovsky(Designation Retained)