This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:26:08 (UTC).

Zimmer v. Unifund CCR Partners et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 Zimmer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Unifund CCR Partners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge J. Garvan Murtha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge J. Garvan Murtha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Zimmer

Defendants

Unifund CCR Partners

Bauer, Gravel, Farnum

John J. Balkunas, Jr.

Pilot Receivables Management, LLC

Unifund CCR, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clare Creek Kelsey

Attorney at Law in the Public Interest, L3C

98 Norford Lake Road

Thetford Center, VT 05075

Defendant Attorneys

Alan H. Abes, Esq.

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

255 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinati, OH 45202

Elizabeth M. Shaffer, Esq.

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

255 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinati, OH 45202

Nicole A. Killoran, Esq.

Attorney at Bauer Gravel Farnham

40 College Street, Suite 100, P.O. Box 607

Burlington, VT 05402-0607

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Daniel Zimmer) (esb) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/13/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole A. Killoran, Esq on behalf of John J. Balkunas, Jr., Bauer, Gravel, Farnum, Pilot Receivables Management, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, Unifund CCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Killoran, Nicole) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#6

(#6) Not a motion, filed in error

#7

(#7) Not a motion, filed in error

#9

(#9) Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice

#10

(#10) Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice

#15

(#15) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting in part 15 Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition re 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 5/22/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/4/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) Event/text clarified added on 5/27/2015 (law). (Entered: 05/27/2015)

#18

(#18) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/17/2015) (jlh). (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 18 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. The main document was not signed and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to 18 as well as this entry. (jlh) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 6/29/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/25/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response/Reply to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (esb) Text clarified on 7/14/2015 (jlh). (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting 21 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 7/20/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/14/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#23

(#23) Response in Opposition to Motion

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Response in Opposition to Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting 21 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 7/20/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/14/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response/Reply to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (esb) Text clarified on 7/14/2015 (jlh). (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 6/29/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/25/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 18 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. The main document was not signed and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to 18 as well as this entry. (jlh) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/17/2015) (jlh). (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) Event/text clarified added on 5/27/2015 (law). (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting in part 15 Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition re 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 5/22/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/4/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelsey, Clare) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Elizabeth M. Shaffer, Esq.; granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alan H. Abes, Esq.; granting 12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Response re: 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 5/8/2015. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 4/13/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Not a motion, filed in error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Not a motion, filed in error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Not a motion, filed in error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John J. Balkunas, Jr., Bauer, Gravel, Farnum, Pilot Receivables Management, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, Unifund CCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Killoran, Nicole) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole A. Killoran, Esq on behalf of John J. Balkunas, Jr., Bauer, Gravel, Farnum, Pilot Receivables Management, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, Unifund CCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Killoran, Nicole) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/13/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Daniel Zimmer) (esb) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John J. Balkunas, Jr., Bauer, Gravel, Farnum, Pilot Receivables Management, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, Unifund CCR, LLC filed by Daniel Zimmer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, G.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant