This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 08:14:45 (UTC).

Zephyr Photonics v. Glenair, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 Zephyr Photonics filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Glenair, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00343

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert C. Jones

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Zephyr Photonics

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Glenair, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Cheng C. Ko

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-3575

Michelle A. Herrera

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Ryan James Cudnik

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

5371 Kietzke Lane

Reno, NV 89511

Steven A. Caloiaro

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

5371 Kietzke Lane

Reno, NV 89511

Evan S. Day

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Michael D Rounds

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLC

5371 Kietzke Lane

Reno, NV 89511

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Jason C. Lo

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Frank Z LaForge

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

5441 Kietzke Lane

Reno, NV 89511

Jeffrey Lau

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher L.L.P.

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jennifer J. Rho

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 S. Grand Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert C. Ryan

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

5441 Kietzke Lane, Second Floor

Reno, NV 89511

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Glenair, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3721922), filed by Zephyr Photonics. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/11/2015. Proof of service due by 10/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Cheng C. Ko to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/15/2015. (no image attached) (BLG) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Evan S. Day to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/15/2015. (no image attached) (BLG) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#4

(#4) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (KR) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenair Inc re 1 Complaint. (KR) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Zephyr Photonics that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Torch Hill Investment Partners, LP, Other Affiliate George Lund Holdings LLC for Zephyr Photonics added. . (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zephyr Photonics. Glenair, Inc. served on 7/10/2015, answer due 7/31/2015. (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 1 Complaint, ; Joint Stipulation & Order Regarding Extension of time for Glenair, Inc. to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Defendant Glenair, Inc.. (LaForge, Frank) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER ON STIPULATION re 8 Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of time for Glenair, Inc. to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Glenair, Inc. answer due 8/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#52

(#52) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Zephyr Photonics, Zephyr Photonics. (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#53

(#53) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 51 Notice (Other). Attorney Cheng C. Ko is in violation of Special Order 109 and is advised to update his CMECF user account information. Counsel has failed to update his CMECF account to reflect the new firm affilation, address, telephone and email address. Please comply with this notice and update your account. (no image attached)(WJ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#54

(#54) ORDER re 52 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney : Evan S. Day withdrawn as attorney for Zephyr Photonics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#55

(#55) SCHEDULING ORDER re 44 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Motions due by 6/5/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#56

(#56) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#57

(#57) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 1/27/2016 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Steven Caloiaro and (By telephone) Cheng Ko; Def Counsel: Jennifer Rho and Frank LaForge; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:00:39 - 9:15:45; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; Having discussed the issue of bifurcation, the parties agree the discovery that occurs prior to March 11, 2016, will be focused on the 28 U.S.C. 1498(a) issue and shall proceed accordingly. The Court approves and signs the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order 44 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#58

(#58) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Glenair, Inc.. (LaForge, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#59

(#59) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michelle A. Herrera and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4009450) filed by Plaintiff Zephyr Photonics, Counter Defendant Zephyr Photonics . (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#60

(#60) ORDER approving 59 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Michelle A. Herrera and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/24/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER approving 59 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Michelle A. Herrera and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/24/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michelle A. Herrera and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4009450) filed by Plaintiff Zephyr Photonics, Counter Defendant Zephyr Photonics . (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Glenair, Inc.. (LaForge, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 1/27/2016 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Steven Caloiaro and (By telephone) Cheng Ko; Def Counsel: Jennifer Rho and Frank LaForge; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:00:39 - 9:15:45; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; Having discussed the issue of bifurcation, the parties agree the discovery that occurs prior to March 11, 2016, will be focused on the 28 U.S.C. 1498(a) issue and shall proceed accordingly. The Court approves and signs the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order 44 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) SCHEDULING ORDER re 44 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Motions due by 6/5/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER re 52 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney : Evan S. Day withdrawn as attorney for Zephyr Photonics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 51 Notice (Other). Attorney Cheng C. Ko is in violation of Special Order 109 and is advised to update his CMECF user account information. Counsel has failed to update his CMECF account to reflect the new firm affilation, address, telephone and email address. Please comply with this notice and update your account. (no image attached)(WJ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Zephyr Photonics, Zephyr Photonics. (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) NOTICE of Change in Firm Affiliation by Zephyr Photonics, Zephyr Photonics. (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cheng C. Ko and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3772474) filed by Plaintiff Zephyr Photonics . (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ON STIPULATION re 8 Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of time for Glenair, Inc. to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Glenair, Inc. answer due 8/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 1 Complaint, ; Joint Stipulation & Order Regarding Extension of time for Glenair, Inc. to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Defendant Glenair, Inc.. (LaForge, Frank) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zephyr Photonics. Glenair, Inc. served on 7/10/2015, answer due 7/31/2015. (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Zephyr Photonics that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Torch Hill Investment Partners, LP, Other Affiliate George Lund Holdings LLC for Zephyr Photonics added. . (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenair Inc re 1 Complaint. (KR) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (KR) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Evan S. Day to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/15/2015. (no image attached) (BLG) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Cheng C. Ko to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/15/2015. (no image attached) (BLG) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Glenair, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3721922), filed by Zephyr Photonics. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/11/2015. Proof of service due by 10/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Rounds, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glenair, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer J. Rho

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank Z LaForge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason C Lo