This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 10:21:07 (UTC).

Z Bayou, LLC et al v. WAFB, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 Z Bayou, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against WAFB, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-04384

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Susie Morgan

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Spencer Lee

Z Bayou, LLC

David Bullard

Defendants

Jason Raymond

John Richoux

Granville Semmes

Jose Figueroa-Baez

Benjamin Mintz

Cheryl Mercedes

Chris Slaughter

Samantha Morgan

WAFB, LLC

Minced Media, Inc.

Charles Lucia

Peter Holland

John Sudol

Michael Russo

Patrick Roig

Heather Heidman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Lucas Hyatt, II

Attorney at Donald L. Hyatt, II, APLC

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2960

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant Attorneys

Barrington Roy Neil

Attorney at Barrington Roy Neil, Attorney at Law

328 Government St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Wade B. Hammett

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Mary Ellen Roy

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Dan Brian Zimmerman

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time for Service Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#29

(#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Patrick Roig served on 3/31/2016, answer due 4/21/2016. (Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(bwn) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Figueroa-Baez, Heather Heidman, Peter Holland, Charles Lucia, Cheryl Mercedes, Minced Media, Inc., Benjamin Mintz, Samantha Morgan, Jason Raymond, John Richoux, Patrick Roig, Michael Russo, Granville Semmes, Chris Slaughter, John Sudol, WAFB, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5019705) filed by Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC, David Bullard.Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party David Bullard(pty:selreq), Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party Spencer Lee(pty:selreq), Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party Z Bayou, LLC(pty:selreq).(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#31

(#31) MOTION to Dismiss by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Chris Slaughter(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#33

(#33) MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chris Slaughter, # 2 Affidavit Cheryl Mercedes, # 3 Affidavit Samantha Morgan, # 4 Affidavit Richard Francis Portier, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 8 Notice of Manual Attachment, # 9 Memorandum in Support, # 10 Notice of Submission)(Roy, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint Filed Pursuant to Court Order (R. Doc. 3) by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#32

(#32) **FILED IN ERROR- Duplicate filing see corrected rec. doc. #33** MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Notice of Submission)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified on 4/5/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for service of process by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#30

(#30) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Appointment of Curators Ad Hoc for Two Defendants and Permission to Serve Same by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Evidence as to attempts to serve Mr. Mintz, # 2 Exhibit Evidence as to attempts to serve Mr. Russo, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) Modified on 4/1/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 03/31/2016)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint Filed Pursuant to Court Order 3 . Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#28

(#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Chris Slaughter served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. (Hyatt, Donald) Modified on 4/1/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 03/31/2016)

#35

(#35) ORDER re 30 MOTION Appointment of Curators Ad Hoc for Two Defendants and Permission to Serve Same - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs have until April 11, 2016, to refile their motion for appointment of curators ad hoc. Plaintiffs shall set the motion as a contested matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#3

(#3) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs amend their complaint by September 21, 2015, at 5:00 p.m. to include a statement of the grounds for the Courts jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#34

(#34) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 26 Motion for Authority to Serve Defendant John Sudol Located Outside the United States by Email Pursuant to FRCP4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016. (bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time for Service Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Plaintiffs have until February 8, 2016, to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/10/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#36

(#36) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs time to serve pursuant to Rule 4(m) is hereby EXTENDED to June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs time to serve pursuant to Rule 4(m) is hereby EXTENDED to June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER re 30 MOTION Appointment of Curators Ad Hoc for Two Defendants and Permission to Serve Same - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs have until April 11, 2016, to refile their motion for appointment of curators ad hoc. Plaintiffs shall set the motion as a contested matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 26 Motion for Authority to Serve Defendant John Sudol Located Outside the United States by Email Pursuant to FRCP4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2016. (bwn) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chris Slaughter, # 2 Affidavit Cheryl Mercedes, # 3 Affidavit Samantha Morgan, # 4 Affidavit Richard Francis Portier, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 8 Notice of Manual Attachment, # 9 Memorandum in Support, # 10 Notice of Submission)(Roy, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) **FILED IN ERROR- Duplicate filing see corrected rec. doc. #33** MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Notice of Submission)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified on 4/5/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION to Dismiss by Samantha Morgan, Chris Slaughter, WAFB, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Chris Slaughter(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Appointment of Curators Ad Hoc for Two Defendants and Permission to Serve Same by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Evidence as to attempts to serve Mr. Mintz, # 2 Exhibit Evidence as to attempts to serve Mr. Russo, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) Modified on 4/1/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Patrick Roig served on 3/31/2016, answer due 4/21/2016. (Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Chris Slaughter served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. (Hyatt, Donald) Modified on 4/1/2016 (mmv). (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jose Figueroa-Baez. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Proposed Order)(Neil, Barrington) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/10/2016. (bwn) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for service of process by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time for Service Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Plaintiffs have until February 8, 2016, to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/10/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time for Service Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(bwn) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint Filed Pursuant to Court Order 3 . Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint Filed Pursuant to Court Order (R. Doc. 3) by David Bullard, Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs amend their complaint by September 21, 2015, at 5:00 p.m. to include a statement of the grounds for the Courts jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Figueroa-Baez, Heather Heidman, Peter Holland, Charles Lucia, Cheryl Mercedes, Minced Media, Inc., Benjamin Mintz, Samantha Morgan, Jason Raymond, John Richoux, Patrick Roig, Michael Russo, Granville Semmes, Chris Slaughter, John Sudol, WAFB, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5019705) filed by Spencer Lee, Z Bayou, LLC, David Bullard.Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party David Bullard(pty:selreq), Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party Spencer Lee(pty:selreq), Attorney Donald Lucas Hyatt, II added to party Z Bayou, LLC(pty:selreq).(Hyatt, Donald) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.