This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 07:07:01 (UTC).

Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated v. PSTL LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2014 Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PSTL LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge David G Campbell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01214

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David G Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated

Defendants

PSTL LLC

Thomas Loeff

Jalyn Baker

Sharon Loeff

GunVault Incorporated

Aaron Baker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron Gabe LaDuke

Attorney at Lake & Cobb PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 206

Tempe, AZ 85281

Lauren Marie Koloseike

Attorney at Cohen Kennedy Dowd & Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Cynthia Christine Albracht-Crogan

Attorney at Cohen Kennedy Dowd & Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

David R Owens

Attorney at Owens Tarabichi LLP

111 N Market St., Ste. 730

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendant Attorneys

Debora Lynn Verdier

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

3636 N Central Ave., 11Th Fl.

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Robert Bryan Zelms

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

3636 N Central Ave., 11Th Fl.

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2014-006878. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10518619 filed by Thomas Loeff, Jalyn Baker, Sharon Loeff, GunVault Incorporated, Aaron Baker. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bryan Zelms, Debora Lynn Verdier on behalf of Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GunVault Incorporated. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10518619. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01214-PHX-JWS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, Jalyn Baker, Aaron Baker. Required document is not attached. Please file the following: Supplemental Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff re: 1 Notice of Removal . (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER FROM THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE JOHN W. SEDWICK. The assigned judge hereby recuses from presiding in this case. The Clerk of Court will please re-assign this case by random lot to another judge in the District of Arizona. NOTE: Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade assigned. All future pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-14-1214-PHX-BSB. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

#41

(#41) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Debora Lynn Verdier. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#40

(#40) Receipt from Maricopa County Superior Court. (ALS) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#39

(#39) Letter re Remand to Maricopa County Superior Court. (ALS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#38

(#38) ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss 11 is denied as moot. Defendant PSTL, LLC's motion to join 22 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to remand 23 is granted. Defendants' motion to transfer 24 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to stay briefing on and consideration of Defendants' motions 25 is granted in part and denied in part. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference scheduled for August 26, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. is vacated. The Clerk shall remand this case to Maricopa County Superior Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#37

(#37) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/18/2014)

#36

(#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 24 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, PSTL LLC. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

#35

(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#34

(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#33

(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, PSTL LLC. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Debora Lynn Verdier. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Receipt from Maricopa County Superior Court. (ALS) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Letter re Remand to Maricopa County Superior Court. (ALS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss 11 is denied as moot. Defendant PSTL, LLC's motion to join 22 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to remand 23 is granted. Defendants' motion to transfer 24 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to stay briefing on and consideration of Defendants' motions 25 is granted in part and denied in part. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference scheduled for August 26, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. is vacated. The Clerk shall remand this case to Maricopa County Superior Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 24 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, PSTL LLC. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (Albracht-Crogan, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, PSTL LLC. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re: 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, PSTL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff. (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER FROM THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE JOHN W. SEDWICK. The assigned judge hereby recuses from presiding in this case. The Clerk of Court will please re-assign this case by random lot to another judge in the District of Arizona. NOTE: Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade assigned. All future pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-14-1214-PHX-BSB. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff re: 1 Notice of Removal . (Verdier, Debora) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff, Jalyn Baker, Aaron Baker. Required document is not attached. Please file the following: Supplemental Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wintrode Enterprises Incorporated. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10518619. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01214-PHX-JWS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GunVault Incorporated. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bryan Zelms, Debora Lynn Verdier on behalf of Aaron Baker, Jalyn Baker, GunVault Incorporated, Sharon Loeff, Thomas Loeff. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2014-006878. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10518619 filed by Thomas Loeff, Jalyn Baker, Sharon Loeff, GunVault Incorporated, Aaron Baker. (submitted by Debora Verdier) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 06/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.