This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 06:21:40 (UTC).

Winchester, Sr. v. Department of Children and Family Services et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2015 Winchester, Sr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Children and Family Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-04573

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Winchester, Sr.

Defendants

Kelly Senseney

Chloe Knight

Kelsey Bourgeois

Department of Children and Family Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derriel Carlton McCorvey

Attorney at Law Office of Derriel C. McCorvey, LLC

115 W. Main St., Suite 14, P. O. Box 2473

Lafayette, LA 70502

Harold Dewey Register, III

Attorney at Register Law Firm

216 Rur Louis Xiv

Lafayette, LA 70508

Defendant Attorney

Michael Courtney Keller

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Winchester. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(McCorvey, Derriel) Modified on 9/22/2015 to add referral (bwn). (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/4/16. (jrc) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

#8

(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Harold Dewey Register, III added to party Mark Winchester, Sr(pty:pla).(Register, Harold) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#27

(#27) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:20 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kelsey Bourgeois, Department of Children and Family Services State of Louisiana, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Mark Winchester. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Derriel Carlton McCorvey added to party Mark Winchester(pty:pla).(McCorvey, Derriel) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#5

(#5) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Harold Dewey Register, III added to party Mark Winchester, Sr(pty:pla).(Register, Harold) Modified on 9/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#6

(#6) ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Derriel C. McCorvey as Attorney by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCorvey, Derriel) Modified on 10/5/2015 (bwn). (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mark Winchester, Sr re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Register, Harold) (Entered: 01/31/2016)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (JLS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Keller, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#20

(#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Department of Children and Family Services, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael Courtney Keller added to party Department of Children and Family Services(pty:dft), Chloe Knight(pty:dft),Kelly Senseney(pty:dft).(Keller, Michael) Modified on 12/30/2015 (cg). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mark Winchester, Sr re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants . (Register, Harold) (Entered: 01/31/2016)

#26

(#26) ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/3/16. (jrc) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/23/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Derriel C. McCorvey as Attorney by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCorvey, Derriel) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting 8 Motion to Enroll Harold Register, III as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants by Kelsey Bourgeois, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Michael Courtney Keller added to party Kelsey Bourgeois(pty:dft).(Keller, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kelly Senseney served on 12/15/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:20 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/3/16. (jrc) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mark Winchester, Sr re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Register, Harold) (Entered: 01/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mark Winchester, Sr re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants . (Register, Harold) (Entered: 01/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Keller, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants by Kelsey Bourgeois, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Michael Courtney Keller added to party Kelsey Bourgeois(pty:dft).(Keller, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/4/16. (jrc) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Department of Children and Family Services, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael Courtney Keller added to party Department of Children and Family Services(pty:dft), Chloe Knight(pty:dft),Kelly Senseney(pty:dft).(Keller, Michael) Modified on 12/30/2015 (cg). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kelly Senseney served on 12/15/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kelsey Bourgeois. (bwn) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 7 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Derriel Carlton McCorvey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting 8 Motion to Enroll Harold Register, III as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Harold Dewey Register, III added to party Mark Winchester, Sr(pty:pla).(Register, Harold) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Derriel C. McCorvey as Attorney by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCorvey, Derriel) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Derriel C. McCorvey as Attorney by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCorvey, Derriel) Modified on 10/5/2015 (bwn). (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Mark Winchester, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Harold Dewey Register, III added to party Mark Winchester, Sr(pty:pla).(Register, Harold) Modified on 9/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/23/2015. (bwn) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (JLS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Winchester. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(McCorvey, Derriel) Modified on 9/22/2015 to add referral (bwn). (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kelsey Bourgeois, Department of Children and Family Services State of Louisiana, Chloe Knight, Kelly Senseney (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Mark Winchester. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Derriel Carlton McCorvey added to party Mark Winchester(pty:pla).(McCorvey, Derriel) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.