This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 10:08:41 (UTC).

Wilson et al v. Everbank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Wilson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Everbank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle and Judge Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-22264

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle

Judge

Judge Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessie Cross

Mattie Cross

Dwight Wilson

Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus

Defendants

Everhome Mortgage

American Security Insurance Company

Assurant, Inc.

Everbank, N.A.

Standard Guaranty Insurance Company

Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company

260 Interstate North Circle Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roosevelt N. Nesmith

Attorney at Law Offices Roosevelt N. Nesmith, LLC

363 Bloomfield Avenue, Suite 2C

Montclair, NJ 07042

Aaron Samuel Podhurst

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck, P.A.

25 W Flagler Street, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33130-1780

Sarah Clasby Engel

Attorney at Harke Clasby & Bushman LLP

9699 Ne Second Avenue

Miami Shores, FL 33138

Catherine E. Anderson

Attorney at Giskan, Solotaroff Anderson & Stewart, LLP

11 Broadway, Suite 2150

New York, NY 10004

Gerard B. Schneller

Attorney at Holland Groves Schneller & Stolze LLC

300 North Tucker Boulevard, Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Randall Seth Crompton

Attorney at Holland, Groves, Schneller & Stolze

300 N. Tucker Blvd., Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Thomas A. Tucker Ronzetti

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 900

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6036

John Scarola

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard, Po Drawer 3626

West Palm Beach, FL 33402-3626

Jeffrey N. Golant

1999 N. University Dr., Suite 213

Coral Springs, FL 33071

Margery Ellen Golant

Attorney at Margery E. Golant, P.A.

2385 Nw Executive Center Drive, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33431

John Gravante, III

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck, P.A.

25 West Flagler Street, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33130

Eric D. Holland

Attorney at Holland Groves Schneller & Stolze LLC

300 North Tucker Boulevard, Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Peter Prieto

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck, P.A.

25 West Flagler Street, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorneys

Olivia Rae Waters Kelman

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900

Miami, FL 33131

David D. Christensen

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Irene C. Freidel

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Todd Matthew Fuller

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA

100 S.E. 2Nd Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Irma T. Reboso-Solares

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

100 S.E. Second Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131-2113

Farrokh Jhabvala

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

100 S.E. Second Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131-2113

Franklin G. Burt

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt P.A.

100 Se 2Nd St, Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131-2113

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#173

(#173) Notice of Appeal by Objectors Jabrani as to 172 Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, 171 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Amirali Jabrani, Janet Jabrani. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-8479303. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Brown, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessie Cross, Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson. American Security Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014; Assurant, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014; Standard Guaranty Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Neary, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#170

(#170) NOTICE by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson re 168 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Class Counsel's Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Order Granting Final Approval (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Neary, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#9

(#9) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. (vp) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Everbank, N.A., Everhome Mortgage. (cbr) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#172

(#172) FINAL JUDGMENT: All individual claims and class claims presented herein, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice against the Named Plaintiffs and all other Settlement Class Members, without fees (including attorneys fees) or costs to any party except as otherwise provided in the Final Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/8/2016. (pes) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (cbr) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) Everbank, N.A., # 2 Summon(s) Everhome Mortgage)(Neary, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#169

(#169) TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2016 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 14 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (yhz) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#168

(#168) ORDER Re: Proposed Final Order on 156 Motion for Settlement. Proposed Final Order due on or before February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/26/2016. (pes) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings, Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/27/2014. (vp) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#174

(#174) Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 173 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Janet Jabrani, Amirali Jabrani. Date received by USCA: 2/12/2016. USCA Case Number: 16-10657-GG. (amb) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerard B. Schneller. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 81954. (cw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric D. Holland. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 81956. (cw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

#166

(#166) NOTICE by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson re 160 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Class Counsel's Notice of Filing Objection Withdrawal) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Withdrawal of Objection by Michelle Meade) (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#171

(#171) ORDER granting Final Approval to Class Action Settlement RE: 154 Motion for Settlement. The proposed class action settlement and Class Counsels fee application are APPROVED in their entirety, and all objections are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/3/2016. (pes) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#167

(#167) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2016. As per the Settlement Conference, the parties shall submit a proposed final order. (rop) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#174) Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 173 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Janet Jabrani, Amirali Jabrani. Date received by USCA: 2/12/2016. USCA Case Number: 16-10657-GG. (amb) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#173) Notice of Appeal by Objectors Jabrani as to 172 Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, 171 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Amirali Jabrani, Janet Jabrani. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-8479303. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Brown, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#172) FINAL JUDGMENT: All individual claims and class claims presented herein, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice against the Named Plaintiffs and all other Settlement Class Members, without fees (including attorneys fees) or costs to any party except as otherwise provided in the Final Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/8/2016. (pes) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) ORDER granting Final Approval to Class Action Settlement RE: 154 Motion for Settlement. The proposed class action settlement and Class Counsels fee application are APPROVED in their entirety, and all objections are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/3/2016. (pes) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#170) NOTICE by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson re 168 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Class Counsel's Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Order Granting Final Approval (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Neary, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#169) TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2016 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 14 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5686 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (yhz) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#168) ORDER Re: Proposed Final Order on 156 Motion for Settlement. Proposed Final Order due on or before February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/26/2016. (pes) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#167) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2016. As per the Settlement Conference, the parties shall submit a proposed final order. (rop) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#166) NOTICE by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson re 160 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Class Counsel's Notice of Filing Objection Withdrawal) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Withdrawal of Objection by Michelle Meade) (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#165) PAPERLESS ORDER denying 164 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. (vp) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings, Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/27/2014. (vp) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric D. Holland. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 81956. (cw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerard B. Schneller. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 81954. (cw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Everbank, N.A., Everhome Mortgage. (cbr) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessie Cross, Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson. American Security Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014; Assurant, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014; Standard Guaranty Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/24/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Neary, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Jessie Cross, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) Everbank, N.A., # 2 Summon(s) Everhome Mortgage)(Neary, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (cbr) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) against American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Everbank, N.A., Everhome Mortgage, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6838639, filed by Jessie Cross, Jesus A. Avelar-Lemus, Mattie Cross, Dwight Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neary, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.