This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 06:12:16 (UTC).

Wilmington Trust, National Association v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Wilmington Trust, National Association filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Caesars Entertainment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-08280

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Trust, National Association

Defendant

Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Christopher Shore

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1155 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Patrick Sibley

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6569

Seth Howard Lieberman

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6569

Jason N Zakia

Attorney at White & Case LLP ( 200 South Biscayne Blvd )

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Philippe Adler

Attorney at Friedman, Kaplan,Seiler & Adelman, LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Lewis Richard Clayton

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Eric Jonathan Seiler

Attorney at Friedman, Kaplan,Seiler & Adelman, LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Hallie Beth Levin

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Christopher Mario Colorado

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Jason Charles Rubinstein

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Michael E. Gertzman

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Ankush Khardori

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11530661)Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-7091 (SAS). Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association.(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association.(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (rch) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Howard Lieberman on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Sibley on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Sibley, Patrick) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#27

(#27) LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Eric Seiler dated February 26, 2016 Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Seiler, Eric) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Beth Levin on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Levin, Hallie) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#25

(#25) AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/6/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Seiler, Eric) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, subject to approval of the Court, that: 1. Defendant's time to answer or move in response to the complaint is hereby extended through and until November 23, 2015. Caesars Entertainment Corporation answer due 11/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/13/2015) (kl) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#22

(#22) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 16 Motion for Jason Zakia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket #15). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/9/2015) (kko) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#21

(#21) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate TPG Capital, Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Hamlet Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Acquisition Company for Caesars Entertainment Corporation. Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Clayton, Lewis) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ankush Khardori on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Khardori, Ankush) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Hurwitz, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Eric Seiler dated February 26, 2016 Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Seiler, Eric) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Beth Levin on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Levin, Hallie) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/6/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Seiler, Eric) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, subject to approval of the Court, that: 1. Defendant's time to answer or move in response to the complaint is hereby extended through and until November 23, 2015. Caesars Entertainment Corporation answer due 11/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/13/2015) (kl) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 16 Motion for Jason Zakia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket #15). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/9/2015) (kko) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate TPG Capital, Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Hamlet Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Acquisition Company for Caesars Entertainment Corporation. Document filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Clayton, Lewis) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ankush Khardori on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Khardori, Ankush) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Hurwitz, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis Richard Clayton on behalf of Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Clayton, Lewis) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons 7 , Complaint 1 , Civil Cover Sheet 2 , Statement of Relatedness 3 , Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 , Notice of Appearance 6 , Judge Scheindlin's Individual Practices and the ECF Rules and Instructions served on Caesars Entertainment Corporation on 10/22/2015. Service was accepted by Kris Eppes, Customer Service Manager. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Sibley on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Sibley, Patrick) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Howard Lieberman on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (rch) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association.(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-7091 (SAS). Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association.(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11530661)Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Shore, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.