This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 22:09:23 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al v. The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller and Judge William C. O'Kelley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller

Judge

Judge William C. O'Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

Defendants

Isabel Maria Vidal

Dunwoody, GA 30338

Mitzi Carr

Mcdonough, GA 30252

The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc.

Bruce Register

Mcdonough, GA 30252

John Lunsford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Lawrence Lublin

Attorney at Rubin Lublin LLC

Suite 150, 3740 Davinci Court

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Bret Jacob Chaness

Attorney at Rubin Lublin LLC

Suite 150, 3740 Davinci Court

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Dennis Daley

Attorney at Garland, Samuel & Loeb, P.C.

3151 Maple Drive, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30305

Edward T. M. Garland

Attorney at Garland Samuel & Loeb

3151 Maple Drive, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30305-2500

John W. Mrosek

Attorney at John W. Mrosek, P.C.

Suite 605, 101 Devant Street

Fayetteville, GA 30214

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6104465.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Warranty Deed, # 2 Exhibit "B" - New Terrance Security Deed, # 3 Exhibit "C" - First Good Samaritan Security Deed, # 4 Exhibit "D" - Register Security Deed, # 5 Exhibit "E" - Second Good Samaritan Security Deed, # 6 Exhibit "F" - New Century Security Deed, # 7 Exhibit "G" - Cancellation, # 8 Exhibit "H" - Disbursement Ledger, # 9 Exhibit "I" - Creditor List, # 10 Exhibit "J" - Bankruptcy Petition, # 11 Exhibit "K" - Fairway Security Deed, # 12 Exhibit "L" - Cancellation, # 13 Exhibit "M" - NFM Security Deed, # 14 Exhibit "N" - Cancellation, # 15 Exhibit "O" - Assignment, # 16 Exhibit "P" - Assignment, # 17 Exhibit "Q" - Assignment, # 18 Exhibit "R" - Deed Under Power, # 19 Exhibit "S" - Certificate, # 20 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc., Mitzi Carr, John Lunsford, Isabel Maria Vidal, and Bruce Register. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Mitzi Carr, # 2 Summons John Lunsford, # 3 Summons Isabel Maria Vidal, # 4 Summons Bruce Register)(rsg) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation(NASDAQ: WSFS) for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (rsg) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. served on 10/24/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Mitzi Carr served on 10/24/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Bruce Register served on 10/22/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. John Lunsford served on 10/22/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Isabel Maria Vidal served on 11/4/2015, answer due 11/25/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Defendants Mitzi Carr and Bruce Register by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/11/2015)

#30

(#30) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#29

(#29) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#28

(#28) ORDER denying as moot the 21 Motion for Order. It is further ORDERED that the parties serve their Initial Disclosures and file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, as required by FED. R. CIV. P. 16 and 26 and LR 16.2, NDGa. within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order. Defendants are further ORDERED to file their Certificate of Interested Persons as required by LR 3.3, NDGa. within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order. The parties are advised that failure to comply with a lawful order of this Court may subject them to sanctions, including as to Plaintiff, a recommendation to the District Judge that the complaint be dismissed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon expiration of the above deadline if the parties fail to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/22/16. (rsg) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. M. Garland on behalf of Isabel Maria Vidal (Garland, Edward) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dennis Daley on behalf of Isabel Maria Vidal (Daley, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dennis Daley on behalf of Mitzi Carr, Bruce Register, The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. (Daley, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. M. Garland on behalf of Mitzi Carr, Bruce Register, The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. (Garland, Edward) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#23

(#23) PROPOSED ORDER Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference re: 21 MOTION for Order Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re 21 MOTION for Order Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference -- Supplement to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" -- Returned Mail)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER denying as moot the 21 Motion for Order. It is further ORDERED that the parties serve their Initial Disclosures and file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, as required by FED. R. CIV. P. 16 and 26 and LR 16.2, NDGa. within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order. Defendants are further ORDERED to file their Certificate of Interested Persons as required by LR 3.3, NDGa. within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order. The parties are advised that failure to comply with a lawful order of this Court may subject them to sanctions, including as to Plaintiff, a recommendation to the District Judge that the complaint be dismissed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon expiration of the above deadline if the parties fail to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/22/16. (rsg) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. M. Garland on behalf of Isabel Maria Vidal (Garland, Edward) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dennis Daley on behalf of Isabel Maria Vidal (Daley, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dennis Daley on behalf of Mitzi Carr, Bruce Register, The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. (Daley, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. M. Garland on behalf of Mitzi Carr, Bruce Register, The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. (Garland, Edward) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PROPOSED ORDER Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference re: 21 MOTION for Order Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re 21 MOTION for Order Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference -- Supplement to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" -- Returned Mail)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Order Setting Scheduling and Discovery Planning Conference by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant John R. Lunsford Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 with Brief In Support by John Lunsford. (Mrosek, John) (Entered: 11/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Defendants Mitzi Carr and Bruce Register by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Isabel Maria Vidal served on 11/4/2015, answer due 11/25/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. John Lunsford served on 10/22/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Bruce Register served on 10/22/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Mitzi Carr served on 10/24/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc. served on 10/24/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Chaness, Bret) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation(NASDAQ: WSFS) for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (rsg) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Good Samaritan Fund, Inc., Mitzi Carr, John Lunsford, Isabel Maria Vidal, and Bruce Register. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Mitzi Carr, # 2 Summons John Lunsford, # 3 Summons Isabel Maria Vidal, # 4 Summons Bruce Register)(rsg) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6104465.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Warranty Deed, # 2 Exhibit "B" - New Terrance Security Deed, # 3 Exhibit "C" - First Good Samaritan Security Deed, # 4 Exhibit "D" - Register Security Deed, # 5 Exhibit "E" - Second Good Samaritan Security Deed, # 6 Exhibit "F" - New Century Security Deed, # 7 Exhibit "G" - Cancellation, # 8 Exhibit "H" - Disbursement Ledger, # 9 Exhibit "I" - Creditor List, # 10 Exhibit "J" - Bankruptcy Petition, # 11 Exhibit "K" - Fairway Security Deed, # 12 Exhibit "L" - Cancellation, # 13 Exhibit "M" - NFM Security Deed, # 14 Exhibit "N" - Cancellation, # 15 Exhibit "O" - Assignment, # 16 Exhibit "P" - Assignment, # 17 Exhibit "Q" - Assignment, # 18 Exhibit "R" - Deed Under Power, # 19 Exhibit "S" - Certificate, # 20 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.