This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 22:24:27 (UTC).

WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BURWELL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2016 WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against BURWELL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH

SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL

SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL

CHINESE HOSPITAL

VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION

ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS

MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER

COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER

INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO

COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND

ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER

DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO

COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW

EL CAMINO HOSPITAL

Defendant

BURWELL

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez

Attorney at SCHERTLER & ONORATO, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20001

Lori Allison Rubin

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER, LLP

3000 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20007

Robert James Spagnoletti

Attorney at SCHERTLER & ONORATO, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20001

Other Attorneys

Daniel Edward Bensing

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L St., N.W., Rm. 12028

Washington, DC 20005

Jason Todd Cohen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Lori Allison Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez (Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE Joint Report by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #15 Order,,, filed by WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Gonzalez, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

#15

(#15) ORDER: At the status conference held on December 15, 2016, plaintiffs in 16-cv-200 represented that they wished to be consolidated with Shands, 14-cv-263. See No. 14-cv-263, Minute Order of Dec. 19, 2016. In the Joint Status Report filed on December 22, 2016, however, they "requested that [the case] remain stayed and not be consolidated with Shands." No. 14-cv-263, Dkt. 68 at 3 & n.3. On or before April 28, 2017, the parties in case 16-cv-200 are instructed to inform the Court whether they request that the stay remain in place and that the Court not consolidate 16-cv-200 with 14-cv-263. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 4/17/2017 to remove the word "Minute" in front of "Order" (kt). (Entered: 04/17/2017)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Counsel's Motion to Withdraw Appearance #14 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Robert J. Spagnoletti is granted leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL served on 2/16/2016 (Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

4 #1

Consent Forms

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#3

(#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (md) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 14-263. (md) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

1 #6

Summons US Attorney

1 #5

Summons US Attorney General

1 #4

Summons Secretary, HHS

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure Certificate

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4403563) filed by MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, CHINESE HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Certificate, #4 Summons Secretary, HHS, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Lori Allison Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez (Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Case STAYED. (kt) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. #17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is STAYED pending the outcome of the appeals of this Court's decision in Shands Jacksonville Med. Ctr., Inc. v. Azar, No. 14-1477, 2018 WL 6831167 (D.D.C. Dec. 28, 2018). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/18/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE Joint Report by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2019. (kt) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is unstayed. It is furthered ORDERED that, in light of this Court's final disposition of most of the cases consolidated with Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. v. Sebelius, 14-cv-263, Dkt. 126 , the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 17, 2019, describing what steps should be taken to bring this case to final resolution. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/10/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Clarification Regarding Case Status #16 , the Court hereby VACATES its Minute Order of December 21, 2016, to the extent that it consolidates Case No. 16-cv-200 with Case No. 14-263. This case is to remain STAYED, but the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to unconsolidate 16-cv-200 from 14-cv-263. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #15 Order,,, filed by WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Gonzalez, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: At the status conference held on December 15, 2016, plaintiffs in 16-cv-200 represented that they wished to be consolidated with Shands, 14-cv-263. See No. 14-cv-263, Minute Order of Dec. 19, 2016. In the Joint Status Report filed on December 22, 2016, however, they "requested that [the case] remain stayed and not be consolidated with Shands." No. 14-cv-263, Dkt. 68 at 3 & n.3. On or before April 28, 2017, the parties in case 16-cv-200 are instructed to inform the Court whether they request that the stay remain in place and that the Court not consolidate 16-cv-200 with 14-cv-263. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 4/17/2017 to remove the word "Minute" in front of "Order" (kt). (Entered: 04/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Counsel's Motion to Withdraw Appearance #14 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Robert J. Spagnoletti is granted leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER: On September 21, 2015, the Court issued a Memorandum Opinion in Civil Case No. 14-263, Shands v. Burwell, which is related to this case. It is hereby ORDERED that on or before March 18, 2016, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report regarding how to proceed in light of the decision in Case No. 14-263, including whether the action should be stayed. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2016. (Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/17/2016. (Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL served on 2/16/2016 (Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (md) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 14-263. (md) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4403563) filed by MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, CHINESE HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Certificate, #4 Summons Secretary, HHS, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Spagnoletti, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Covenant Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where BURWELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Chinese Hospital Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter Coast Hospital is a litigant