This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2018 at 03:47:25 (UTC).

Widmer v. Butler et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2014 Widmer filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Butler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Philip M. Frazier. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00630

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Philip M. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Widmer

Defendants

Major Westfall

Sgt Evoldi

Chandler

Sgt Pelker

Kimberly Butler

Phelps

Rednour

Sgt Bledsoe

Mezo

Alex Jones

C Roth

 

Court Documents

#85

(#85) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 84 ); DISMISSES without prejudice the remaining claims in this case; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/7/2015. (jdh)

#65

(#65) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 57 ); CONSTRUES the Amended Complaint to contain the six causes of action described in the Report; DISMISSES Count 5 against defendants Butler, Jones and Westfall with prejudi ce; DISMISSES Count 6 without prejudice; DENIES Widmers motions for a preliminary injunction (Docs. 4 , 19 & 43 ); and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/1/2014. (jdh)

#63

(#63) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court finds that this action against Chandler is DISMISSED without prejudice and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Defendant Chandler is terminated from this action. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2014. (jdh)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Widmer, granting in part and denying in part 3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Michael Widmer. Defendants AHRENDS and HILL are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Doc. 4) is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, who shall resolve the request for injunctive relief as soon as practicable, and issue a report and recommendation. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/5/14. (beb)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 84 ); DISMISSES without prejudice the remaining claims in this case; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/7/2015. (jdh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 57 ); CONSTRUES the Amended Complaint to contain the six causes of action described in the Report; DISMISSES Count 5 against defendants Butler, Jones and Westfall with prejudi ce; DISMISSES Count 6 without prejudice; DENIES Widmers motions for a preliminary injunction (Docs. 4 , 19 & 43 ); and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/1/2014. (jdh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court finds that this action against Chandler is DISMISSED without prejudice and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at the close of the case. Defendant Chandler is terminated from this action. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2014. (jdh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Widmer, granting in part and denying in part 3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Michael Widmer. Defendants AHRENDS and HILL are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Doc. 4) is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier, who shall resolve the request for injunctive relief as soon as practicable, and issue a report and recommendation. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/5/14. (beb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mezo is a litigant

Latest cases where Chandler is a litigant

Latest cases where HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant