This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:23:42 (UTC).

Wickfire, LLC v. Trimax Media, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Wickfire, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Trimax Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00827

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wickfire, LLC

Defendants

Laura Woodruff

Josh West

WREI, Inc

Trimax Media, Inc

In Re

BrandVerity, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ruth Sarah Lee

Attorney at GARDERE WYNNE SEWELL LLP (TX)

1601 Elm Street, Ste 3000

Dallas, TX 75201

Peter Vogel

Attorney at GARDERE WYNNE SEWELL LLP (TX)

1601 Elm Street, Ste 3000

Dallas, TX 75201

John B Crosetto

Attorney at GARVEY SCHUBERT BARER (WA)

1191 Second Ave, Ste 1800

Seattle, WA 98101-2939

In Re Attorney

Alan Scott Middleton

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALAN S. MIDDLETON

1501 N. 200Th Street, Suite 102

Shoreline, WA 98133

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY, filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc, TO RESPONSE to [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

#12

(#12) Supplemental DECLARATION of David Naffziger filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by BrandVerity, Inc. (Receipt #: SEA70862). (Attachments: # (1) DECLARATION of Alan S. Middleton, # (2) DECLARATION of David Naffziger)(DJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2015: # (3) Subpoena) (DJ).

#2

(#2) Notice by Clerk: BrandVerity, Inc.'s [1] MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena is noted for 5/22/2015. (DJ) Modified on 5/20/2015 (KERR).

#15

(#15) Second DECLARATION of Sara A. Brown filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Crosetto, John)

#13

(#13) NOTICE Intent to File Surreply re [10] Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc. (Crosetto, John)

#7

(#7) ORDER re [5] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Vogel for Trimax Media, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting BrandVerity Inc's [1] Motion to Quash Subpoena by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Vogel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Trimax Media, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4022393 (Crosetto, John)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ruth Sarah Lee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Trimax Media, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4022377 (Crosetto, John) Modified Attorney's Texas Bar No. is 24090227 on 5/20/2015 (DS).

#14

(#14) SURREPLY filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Crosetto, John)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE, by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc, to [1] MOTION to Quash. (Crosetto, John)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John B Crosetto on behalf of Defendant Trimax Media, Inc. (Crosetto, John)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Alan Middleton filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Sara A. Brown filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(Crosetto, John)

#6

(#6) ORDER re [4] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ruth Lee for Trimax Media, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting BrandVerity Inc's [1] Motion to Quash Subpoena by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Second DECLARATION of Sara A. Brown filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SURREPLY filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE Intent to File Surreply re [10] Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc. (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Supplemental DECLARATION of David Naffziger filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Alan Middleton filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY, filed by In Re BrandVerity, Inc, TO RESPONSE to [1] MOTION to Quash (Middleton, Alan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Sara A. Brown filed by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc re [1] MOTION to Quash (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE, by Defendant Trimax Media, Inc, to [1] MOTION to Quash. (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re [5] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Vogel for Trimax Media, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re [4] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ruth Lee for Trimax Media, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Vogel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Trimax Media, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4022393 (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ruth Sarah Lee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Trimax Media, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4022377 (Crosetto, John) Modified Attorney's Texas Bar No. is 24090227 on 5/20/2015 (DS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John B Crosetto on behalf of Defendant Trimax Media, Inc. (Crosetto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice by Clerk: BrandVerity, Inc.'s [1] MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena is noted for 5/22/2015. (DJ) Modified on 5/20/2015 (KERR).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by BrandVerity, Inc. (Receipt #: SEA70862). (Attachments: # (1) DECLARATION of Alan S. Middleton, # (2) DECLARATION of David Naffziger)(DJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2015: # (3) Subpoena) (DJ).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.