This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:01:37 (UTC).

Wetro Lan LLC v. D-Link Systems, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 Wetro Lan LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against D-Link Systems, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wetro Lan LLC

Defendant

D-Link Systems, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Hansley

Attorney at Austin Hansley PLLC

5050 Quorum Drive, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75254

Defendant Attorneys

Christine Yang

Attorney at Law Offices of S J Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suites 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Herbert A Yarbrough, III

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Victoria D. Hao

Attorney at Law Offices of S J Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street, Suites 101-102

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/01/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-00041. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Wetro Lan LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christine Yang on behalf of D-Link Systems, Incorporated. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5140999. (Yang, Christine) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christine Yang on behalf of D-Link Systems, Incorporated. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5136072. (Yang, Christine) Modified on 4/7/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by D-Link Systems, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent D-Link Corporation for D-Link Systems, Incorporated. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by D-Link Systems, Incorporated.(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wetro Lan LLC. for D-Link Systems, Incorporated (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant, D-Link Systems, Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.( Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria D. Hao on behalf of D-Link Systems, Incorporated (Hao, Victoria) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re D-Link Systems, Incorporated. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/29/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to D-Link Systems, Incorporated. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wetro Lan LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wetro Lan LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5016271.), filed by Wetro Lan LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wetro Lan LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where D-Link Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Austin Lee Hansley