This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 16:10:19 (UTC).

Western Refining Southwest, Inc. et al v. 3.7820 Acres of Land in McKinley County, New Mexico et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2014 Western Refining Southwest, Inc filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 3 7820 Acres of Land in McKinley County, New Mexico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00804

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Defendants

Mary B. Tom

Philbert Morgan

Dugan Morgan

Helen C. Frank

Church Rock, NM 87301

Jerry Adakai

Carlos Manuel Tovar

Gallup, NM 87301

Darryl Irving

Church Rock, NM 87311

Karen Yazzie

United States of America

Justin Adakai

Gallup, NM 87301

Ruby A. Randolph

Gallup, NM 87305

Roderick Martinez

Lorraine Tom

Pauline K. Frank

Church Rock, NM 87311

Chee Nashbah

Alvin Adakai

Anslem Morgan

Crownpoint, NM 87313

Lorriane F. Tom

Church Rock, NM 87311

Andrea Starks

Gallup, NM 87301

Rose Austin

Cortez, CO 81321

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Grohman

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Howard R. Thomas

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Other Attorneys

Cassie Marie Fleming

Attorney at New Mexico Legal Aid

Post Office Box 1475, 211 W. Mesa, Suite 5 & 5

Gallup, NM 87305

John R. Cooney

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Charles A. Armgardt

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Mahlon C. Wigton

Attorney at DNA-People's Legal Services, Inc.

Post Office Box 116

Crownpoint, NM 87313

Thomas L Sansonetti

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

2515 Warren Avenue, Suite 450

Cheyenne, WY 82001

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Refining Southwest, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Giant Industries, Inc. for Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Western Refining Logistics, LP, Other Affiliate Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Western Refining Company, L.P., Other Affiliate Western Refining LP, LLC for Western Refining Pipeline, LLC. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#4

(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#5

(#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. of Filing Notices of Condemnation (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION that case be governed by D.N.M. LR-CIV. 16 by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Frank Adakai. (yc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#9

(#9) Letter by Frank Adakai to Mr. Cooney and Mr. Armgardt (yc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#167

(#167) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Esther M. Frank (yc) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

#166

(#166) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER STAYING LAWSUIT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. When the IBIA appeal is completed, Plaintiffs must file a status report on the outcome of the IBIA appeal and how that outcome affects this lawsuit. (tah) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

#165

(#165) Sur- REPLY to Sefina Garcia's re 149 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#164

(#164) ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 152 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Surreply due 5/20/2015. (tah) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#163

(#163) RESPONSE to Motion re 161 MOTION for Order (Motion to Submit an Untimely Answer to the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Condemnation by Louise M. Mariano) filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#162

(#162) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Louise M. Mariano. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC.(jn) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#161

(#161) MOTION To Submit an Untimely Answer to the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Comdemnation by Louise M. Mariano. (jn) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#160

(#160) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. re 148 Opposed MOTION for Order Requiring United States to Represent Allottees filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC (Cooney, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#159

(#159) REPLY to Response to Motion re 148 Opposed MOTION for Order Requiring United States to Represent Allottees filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooney, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#167) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Esther M. Frank (yc) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#166) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER STAYING LAWSUIT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. When the IBIA appeal is completed, Plaintiffs must file a status report on the outcome of the IBIA appeal and how that outcome affects this lawsuit. (tah) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#165) Sur- REPLY to Sefina Garcia's re 149 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#164) ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 152 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Surreply due 5/20/2015. (tah) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#163) RESPONSE to Motion re 161 MOTION for Order (Motion to Submit an Untimely Answer to the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Condemnation by Louise M. Mariano) filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#162) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Louise M. Mariano. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC.(jn) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#161) MOTION To Submit an Untimely Answer to the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Comdemnation by Louise M. Mariano. (jn) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#160) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. re 148 Opposed MOTION for Order Requiring United States to Represent Allottees filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC (Cooney, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#159) REPLY to Response to Motion re 148 Opposed MOTION for Order Requiring United States to Represent Allottees filed by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooney, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. re 152 MOTION to Disregard New Argument or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply re 149 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC (Cooney, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Pauline K. Frank. (yc) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter by Frank Adakai to Mr. Cooney and Mr. Armgardt (yc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Frank Adakai. (yc) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION that case be governed by D.N.M. LR-CIV. 16 by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc. of Filing Notices of Condemnation (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Refining Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Western Refining Logistics, LP, Other Affiliate Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Western Refining Company, L.P., Other Affiliate Western Refining LP, LLC for Western Refining Pipeline, LLC. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Refining Southwest, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Giant Industries, Inc. for Western Refining Southwest, Inc.. (Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Western Refining Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooney, John) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.