This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 00:32:11 (UTC).

Warner v. City of Hayward et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2015 Warner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Hayward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler and Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore (Settlement). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-01402

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore (Settlement)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Decoryan Warner

Defendants

Michael Nguyen

City of Hayward

Raymond Sisson

Michael Cristol

Thomas Spillner

Christopher Suzuki

Robert Martinez

Musa Abedrabbo

Trevor Vonnegut

Jerrrey Snell

Justin Ferreryra

Brandon Tong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John L. Burris

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1120

Oakland, CA 94621

DeWitt Marcellus Lacy

Attorney at Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1120

Oakland, CA 94621

Defendant Attorney

Justin Christopher Nishioka

Attorney at City of Hayward

777 B Street

Hayward, CA 94541-5007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9394102.). Filed byDecoryan Warner. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, John) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Decoryan Warner.. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Decoryan Warner. Musa Abedrabbo served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; City of Hayward served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Michael Cristol served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Justin Ferreryra served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Robert Martinez served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Michael Nguyen served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Raymond Sisson served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Jerrrey Snell served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Thomas Spillner served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Christopher Suzuki served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Brandon Tong served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Trevor Vonnegut served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015. (Burris, John) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT byMusa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due May 22, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 15 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for October 15, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement October 8, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Order Setting Settlement Conference, (to continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Order Setting Settlement Conference, (to continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Trevor Vonnegut, Jerrrey Snell, City of Hayward, Thomas Spillner, Robert Martinez, Raymond Sisson, Brandon Tong, Michael Cristol, Christopher Suzuki, Justin Ferreryra, Musa Abedrabbo, Michael Nguyen Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/11/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#19

(#19) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#20

(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 12/17/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference on 10/15/2015 is vacated.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONDERENCE DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Decoryan Warner. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 21 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#23

(#23) CLERK'S NOTICE - Notice is hereby given that the Settlement Conference, previously set for November 20, 2015, is continued to December 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT OFFICERS FROM ATTENDING DECEMBER 16, 2015 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 12/3/2015) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CLERK'S NOTICE - Notice is hereby given that the Settlement Conference, previously set for November 20, 2015, is continued to December 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 21 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONDERENCE DEADLINE AND CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Decoryan Warner. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 12/17/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference on 10/15/2015 is vacated.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Order Setting Settlement Conference, (to continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Trevor Vonnegut, Jerrrey Snell, City of Hayward, Thomas Spillner, Robert Martinez, Raymond Sisson, Brandon Tong, Michael Cristol, Christopher Suzuki, Justin Ferreryra, Musa Abedrabbo, Michael Nguyen Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/11/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Order Setting Settlement Conference, (to continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 15 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for October 15, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement October 8, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2015 filed by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 9/3/2015) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut.. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due May 22, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT byMusa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (Nishioka, Justin) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Decoryan Warner. Musa Abedrabbo served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; City of Hayward served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Michael Cristol served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Justin Ferreryra served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Robert Martinez served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Michael Nguyen served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Raymond Sisson served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Jerrrey Snell served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Thomas Spillner served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Christopher Suzuki served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Brandon Tong served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015; Trevor Vonnegut served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015. (Burris, John) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Decoryan Warner.. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Musa Abedrabbo, City of Hayward, Michael Cristol, Justin Ferreryra, Robert Martinez, Michael Nguyen, Raymond Sisson, Jerrrey Snell, Thomas Spillner, Christopher Suzuki, Brandon Tong, Trevor Vonnegut. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9394102.). Filed byDecoryan Warner. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, John) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less