This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 12:45:28 (UTC).

WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. WEBPOWER, INC et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2015 WAG ACQUISITION, L L C filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against WEBPOWER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer and Judge Esther Salas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-03581

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer

Judge

Judge Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C.

Defendant

DOES 1-20

Counter Defendant

WAG ACQUISITION, LLC

Counter Claimant

WEBPOWER, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

RONALD ABRAMSON

Attorney at Lewis Baach PLLC

405 Lexington Avenue, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10174

DAVID G. LISTON

ARI JASON JAFFESS

Counter Claimant Attorneys

GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA

JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN

KEITH J. MILLER

TODD MATTHEW NOSHER

ANDREW P. MACARTHUR

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to WEBPOWER, INC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jackeline Barco* (JB, ) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) Modified on 6/2/2015 (JB, ). (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#4

(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120, # 2 COMPLAINT) (JB, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (JAFFESS, ARI) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. WEBPOWER, INC waiver sent on 5/28/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (LISTON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. MACARTHUR on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (MACARTHUR, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#46

(#46) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/6/2016. (jqb, (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#47

(#47) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#48

(#48) Letter from Ronald Abramson re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#49

(#49) Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 48 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#50

(#50) ORDER that WAG shall be permitted to file a sur-reply brief not to exceed 5 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (sr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#51

(#51) TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#52

(#52) BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#53

(#53) TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ). (Entered: 03/10/2016)

#54

(#54) Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ). (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER that WAG shall be permitted to file a sur-reply brief not to exceed 5 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (sr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 48 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Letter from Ronald Abramson re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/6/2016. (jqb, (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 40 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEBPOWER, INC. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. MACARTHUR on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (MACARTHUR, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (LISTON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. WEBPOWER, INC waiver sent on 5/28/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (JAFFESS, ARI) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120, # 2 COMPLAINT) (JB, ) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) Modified on 6/2/2015 (JB, ). (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to WEBPOWER, INC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jackeline Barco* (JB, ) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1-20, WEBPOWER, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6416363) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Related Case Notice, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JB, ) Modified on 6/2/2015 (JB, ). (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RONALD ABRAMSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI JASON JAFFESS