This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 08:51:55 (UTC).

VTech Communications Limited v. Microchip Technology Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2014 VTech Communications Limited filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Microchip Technology Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02235

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VTech Communications Limited

Defendants

Microchip Technology Ireland

Microchip Technology Hong Kong Limited

Microchip Technology Ireland Limited

Microchip Technology Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R Nuttall

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP - Chicago, IL

115 S Lasalle St., Ste. 3100

Chicago, IL 60603

Erin Elizabeth Bradham

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2382

Melissa Elizabeth Posner

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2382

Jason M Porter

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2382

Karl Michael Tilleman

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2382

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Taylor Arrowsmith

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Eric Michael Fraser

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Sharad H Desai

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10950748 filed by VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VTech Communications Limited identifying Corporate Parent VTech Holdings Limited for VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10950748. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02235-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Microchip Technology Hong Kong Limited, Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER discouraging a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/9/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: Service of Court's 10/09/14 Order by VTech Communications Limited . (Tilleman, Karl) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James R Nuttall on behalf of VTech Communications Limited. (BAS) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

#40

(#40) REPLY re: 36 Objection to the Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif by Plaintiff VTech Communications Limited. (Tilleman, Karl) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#39

(#39) MINUTE ORDER: Oral argument on the pending motions set for 10/2/2015 is continued to 10/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#38

(#38) ORDER that the parties shall appear for oral argument on the pending motions on 10/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. FURTHER ORDERED that, to assist the court reporter, the parties shall prepare and bring to the oral argument a Table of Authorities, in alphabetical order, which includes all of the authorities on which the parties will rely at the oral argument. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/25/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE re: 36 Objection Microchip Technology Ireland's Response to VTech Communication Ltd's Objection to the Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif by Defendant Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#36

(#36) OBJECTION re: 35 Reply Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif (Dkt. #35-1) in Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff VTech Communications Limited. (Porter, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#35

(#35) *REPLY to Response to Motion re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Fraser, Eric) *Modified to correct event - attorney noticed on 8/11/2015 (REK). (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and allowing Microchip Inc. and Microchip Ireland to exceed the page limit by three pages. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/7/2015.(MMO) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#33

(#33) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting the parties' 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to reply in support of the motion to dismiss is extended to 8/10/2015. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/29/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) REPLY re: 36 Objection to the Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif by Plaintiff VTech Communications Limited. (Tilleman, Karl) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE ORDER: Oral argument on the pending motions set for 10/2/2015 is continued to 10/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER that the parties shall appear for oral argument on the pending motions on 10/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. FURTHER ORDERED that, to assist the court reporter, the parties shall prepare and bring to the oral argument a Table of Authorities, in alphabetical order, which includes all of the authorities on which the parties will rely at the oral argument. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/25/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) RESPONSE re: 36 Objection Microchip Technology Ireland's Response to VTech Communication Ltd's Objection to the Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif by Defendant Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OBJECTION re: 35 Reply Third Declaration of Nawaz Sharif (Dkt. #35-1) in Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff VTech Communications Limited. (Porter, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) *REPLY to Response to Motion re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Fraser, Eric) *Modified to correct event - attorney noticed on 8/11/2015 (REK). (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and allowing Microchip Inc. and Microchip Ireland to exceed the page limit by three pages. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/7/2015.(MMO) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting the parties' 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to reply in support of the motion to dismiss is extended to 8/10/2015. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/29/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James R Nuttall on behalf of VTech Communications Limited. (BAS) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: Service of Court's 10/09/14 Order by VTech Communications Limited . (Tilleman, Karl) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraser, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER discouraging a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/9/2014. (MMO) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Microchip Technology Hong Kong Limited, Microchip Technology Incorporated, Microchip Technology Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10950748. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02235-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VTech Communications Limited identifying Corporate Parent VTech Holdings Limited for VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10950748 filed by VTech Communications Limited. (submitted by Karl Tilleman) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.