This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:58:14 (UTC).

Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC v. Konami Gaming, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2015 Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Konami Gaming, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02075

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.

Konami Gaming, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin J Fox

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - Los Angeles

707 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Ryan J Malloy

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - Los Angeles

707 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - '610 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - '862 Patent

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1706. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE., Cases associated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.. Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2016, answer due 3/4/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting 9 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Konami Gaming, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/4/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER denying 10 Motion to amend caption. Any pleadings provided to the jury as exhibits can be amended as needed to reflect the current parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/04/2016. (no document attached) (Payne, Roy) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION to Change Style of Case by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. Konami Gaming, Inc. served on 12/17/2015, answer due 1/7/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Konami Gaming, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Konami Gaming, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5526348.), filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '862 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '610 Patent, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Konami Gaming, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth L DeRieux