This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:47:26 (UTC).

Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC v. DraftKings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DraftKings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01706

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiff

Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC

Defendant

DraftKings, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

Take-Two Interactive Sofware, Inc.

Fantasy Aces, LP

Yahoo! Inc.

Big Fish Games, Inc.

Microsoft Corporation

FantasyHub, Inc.

Fantasy Aces GP, LLC

NFL Enterprises, LLC

Amazon Digital Services, Inc.

Stars Fantasy Sports Subco, LLC

Activision Blizzard, Inc.

FanDuel, Inc.

Amazon.com, Inc.

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC

Electronic Arts, Inc.

Zynga, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Consolidated Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Eric A Buresh

Attorney at Erise IP, PA - Overland Park

6201 College Blvd, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 66211

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Brent Douglas McCabe

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Paul Redmond Hart

Attorney at Erise, IP, PA - Colorado

5600 Greenwood Plaza Blvd, Suite 200

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Megan Joanna Redmond

Attorney at Erise IP, PA - Overland Park

6201 College Blvd, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 66211

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Douglas F Stewart

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani - Seattle

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6200

Seattle, WA 98104

Hilary Preston

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP - NY

666 Fifth Ave, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Janice Le Ta

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP - Austin

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

Matthew Joseph Ricciardi

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP - D.C.

2200 Pennsylvania Ave N.W., Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

Catherine Margaret Maness

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Joshua Reed Thane

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Karl S Stern

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231, 1127 Judson Road, Suite 220

Longview, TX 75606

Other Attorneys

Ryan J Malloy

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - Los Angeles

707 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Benjamin J Fox

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - Los Angeles

707 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#73

#74

#75

#76

#77

#78

#79

#80

#81

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Strike 22 Response to Non-Motion,,,,,, Defendant's Motion to Strike Declarations of Craig Wills, PH.D. and Dorian S. Berger [Dkt. Nos. 22-1 - 22-38] filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) RESPONSE to 52 Response to Non-Motion Sur-Reply to NFL Enterprises, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. David Folsom, Jackson Walker, L.L.P., 6002 Summerfield Drive, Suite B, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number 903- 255-3251, fax number 903-255-3266, and email dfolsom@jw.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts by DraftKings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Declaration of J. Macinnes)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE by MLB Advanced Media, L.P. OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge Folsom, Mike Patterson, filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/24/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by DraftKings, Inc., Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER granting 71 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Electronic Arts, Inc. filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC., Electronic Arts, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv2053) terminated., Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/23/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER granting 70 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, Inc. filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC., Amazon Digital Services, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv2096) and Amazon.com, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv2096) terminated., Attorney Catherine Margaret Maness and Joshua Reed Thane terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/23/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DraftKings, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DraftKings, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DraftKings, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. DraftKings, Inc. served on 11/4/2015, answer due 11/25/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/3/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to DraftKings, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DraftKings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5464986.), filed by Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '862 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '610 Patent, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Virtual Gaming Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zynga Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DraftKings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC is a litigant