This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 16:49:15 (UTC).

Village of Jewett v. North American Coal Royalty Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2014 Village of Jewett filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against North American Coal Royalty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel and Judge James L Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel

Judge

Judge James L Graham

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Village of Jewett

Jewett, OH 43986

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Dale Pennsylvania Royalty, LP

4568 Mayfield Road, Suite 204

Cleveland, OH 44121

North American Coal Royalty Company

50 W. Broad Street, Suite 1800

Columbus, OH 43215

TOTAL E&P USA, INC.

1300 E. 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Mountaineer Natural Gas Company

16 West Cherry Avenue

Washington, PA 15301

Dale Property Services Penn, LP

4568 Mayfield Road, Suite 204

Cleveland, OH 44121

CHK Utica, LLC

1300 E. 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Chesapeake Exploration, LLC

1300 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Intervenor Defendant

State Of Ohio

2045 Morse Road, C-2

Columbus, OH 43229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Evans O'Farrell

220 Market Aveneu South, 8Th Floor

Canton, OH 44702

Gary A Corroto

Attorney at Tzangas Plakas Mannos Ltd.

220 Market Avenue

South Canton, OH 44702

Lee E Plakas

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

220 Market Ave. S., 8Th Floor

Canton, OH 44702

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jeffrey D Ubersax

Attorney at North Point

901 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Dean C Williams

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Gerald Eugene Dailey

Attorney at Office of the Ohio Attorney General

2045 Morse Road, C-2

Columbus, OH 43229-6693

Jennifer Ann Barrett

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

2045 Morse Road, Building C-2

Columbus, OH 43229

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#17

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

#23

#24

#25

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Intervene Instanter, 22 MOTION to Intervene to Defend the Consitutionality of R.C. 5301.56 (1989) Reply to Response in Opposition filed by Intervenor Defendant State Of Ohio. (Dailey, Gerald) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Intervene Instanter, 22 MOTION to Intervene to Defend the Consitutionality of R.C. 5301.56 (1989) filed by Defendant North American Coal Royalty Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Ubersax, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Intervene Instanter by Intervenor Defendant State Of Ohio. (Dailey, Gerald) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Intervene to Defend the Consitutionality of R.C. 5301.56 (1989) by Intervenor Defendant State Of Ohio. (Dailey, Gerald) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Of Ohio. (Dailey, Gerald) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Letter from From Mike DeWine. (sr1) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/19/2014. (ds) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants CHK Utica, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Dale Pennsylvania Royalty, LP, Dale Property Services Penn, LP, North American Coal Royalty Company, TOTAL E&P USA, INC.. (Williams, Dean) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Reply re 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendant North America Coal Royalty Company by Counter Defendants Village of Jewett, Village of Jewett, Plaintiff Village of Jewett. (Corroto, Gary) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Reply re 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendants Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, CHK Utica, LLC, Total E&P USA, Inc., Dale Property Services Penn, LP and Dale Pennsylvania Royalty, LP by Counter Defendants Village of Jewett, Village of Jewett, Plaintiff Village of Jewett. (Corroto, Gary) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Mountaineer Natural Gas Company. (sr1) (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Plaintiff Village of Jewett Request for Summons (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dale Pennsylvania Royalty, LP on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dale Property Services Penn, LP on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to TOTAL E&P USA, INC. on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to CHK Utica, LLC on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Chesapeake Exploration, LLC on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to North American Coal Royalty Company on 2/19/2014, answer due 4/21/2014. (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:14-cv-175 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 03/24/2014. (sr1) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4452197), filed by Village of Jewett. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M) (O'Farrell, Joshua) (Entered: 02/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHK Utica, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Total E & P U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CHESAPEAKE EXPLORATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant