This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 18:59:03 (UTC).

Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support v. WesTech Engineering, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 Veolia Water Solutions Technologies Support filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against WesTech Engineering, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00592

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support

Counter Claimant

WesTech Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J. Biller

Larry L. Coats

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Clifton E. McCann

John T. Kivus

W. Swain Wood

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WesTech Engineering, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 8,961,785, # 3 Exhibit B - SuperDisc brochure, # 4 Exhibit C - SuperDisc webpage, # 5 Proposed Summons) (Coats, Larry) Modified on 11/16/2015 to correct docket party text. (Felder, J) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#2

(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies, Corporate Parent Veolia Environnement, Corporate Parent Veolia Eau - Compagnie Generale des Eaux for Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#3

(#3) Filing Fee Receipt (No. RAL046882) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

#4

(#4) PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 16, 2015. (Felder, J) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to WesTech Engineering, Inc. Counsel is directed to print summons and effect service. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Larry L. Coats on behalf of Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony J. Biller on behalf of Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. WesTech Engineering, Inc. served on 11/24/2015, answer due 12/15/2015. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#23

(#23) Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of WesTech Engineering, Inc. (McCann, Clifton) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#22

(#22) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#21

(#21) ANSWER regarding 13 Counterclaim filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#20

(#20) Memorandum in Support regarding 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#18

(#18) Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of All Defendants. (McCann, Clifton) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#17

(#17) *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY 18 * - Notice of Appearance for non-district by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of All Defendants. (McCann, Clifton) Modified on 1/20/2016 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#16

(#16) Financial Disclosure Statement by WesTech Engineering, Inc. (Wood, W.) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#15

(#15) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 2/19/2016. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/15/2016. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of WesTech Engineering, Inc. (McCann, Clifton) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER regarding 13 Counterclaim filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Memorandum in Support regarding 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2016 to clarify docket entry text. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Notice of Appearance for non-district counsel by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of All Defendants. (McCann, Clifton) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY 18 * - Notice of Appearance for non-district by Clifton E. McCann on behalf of All Defendants. (McCann, Clifton) Modified on 1/20/2016 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Financial Disclosure Statement by WesTech Engineering, Inc. (Wood, W.) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 2/19/2016. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/15/2016. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Appearance filed by John T. Kivus on behalf of WesTech Engineering, Inc. (Kivus, John) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. WesTech Engineering, Inc. answer due 1/14/2016. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 12/16/2015. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. WesTech Engineering, Inc. served on 11/24/2015, answer due 12/15/2015. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony J. Biller on behalf of Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Larry L. Coats on behalf of Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to WesTech Engineering, Inc. Counsel is directed to print summons and effect service. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 16, 2015. (Felder, J) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing Fee Receipt (No. RAL046882) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies, Corporate Parent Veolia Environnement, Corporate Parent Veolia Eau - Compagnie Generale des Eaux for Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Coats, Larry) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against WesTech Engineering, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 8,961,785, # 3 Exhibit B - SuperDisc brochure, # 4 Exhibit C - SuperDisc webpage, # 5 Proposed Summons) (Coats, Larry) Modified on 11/16/2015 to correct docket party text. (Felder, J) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.