This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 09:16:16

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/04/1998 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Veeck against Southern Bldg Code in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 4:98-CV-00063
  • Filing Date 03/04/1998
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Judge David Folsom
  • Courthouse Texas Eastern District

Party Details

  • Counter Claimant Southern Building Code Congress International Inc
  • Represented By
    • Robert J Veal
  • Petitioner Henry H Perritt, Jr
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Undetermined Clyde Moody Siebman
  • Represented By
    • Clyde Moody Siebman
  • Petitioner National Fire Protection Association Inc
  • Represented By
    • Damon Michael Young
  • Counter Defendant Peter Veeck
  • Represented By
    • Eric Phillip Weisberg

Court Documents

#126

(#126) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Southern Bu...

Fees Apply
#125

(#125) ORDER that the parties have selected Clyde Siebman to...

Fees Apply
#124

(#124) ORDER denying 109 Motion for final judgment . Signed ...

Fees Apply
#123

(#123) ORDER granting 122 Motion to appoint Clyde Siebman as...

Fees Apply
#122

(#122) MOTION for appointment of mediator by Southern Buildi...

Fees Apply
#120

(#120) Reply by Peter Veeck to response to [113-1] motion fo...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2004
  • (#127) Final JUDGMENT in favor of Pltf Peter Veeck declaring that he did not infringe SBCCI's copyright by publishing the codes of Anna and Savoy Texas on the Internet. Pltf's claim for attys fees and costs is dismissed with prejudice. Any motion not previously ruled on is denied. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/15/04. cc:attys on 7/20/04(ttm, ) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
  • 06/29/2004
  • (#126) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Southern Building Code Congress International Inc, Peter Veeck. (lhj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
  • 02/27/2004
  • (#125) ORDER that the parties have selected Clyde Siebman to mediate the attys fees raised in pltf motion for final judgmem. Denying without prejudice to refiling 113 Motion for Attorney Fees, terminating 117 Motion attorney fees, terminating 120 Motion attorney fees . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/27/04. faxed to attys by Judges staff (ttm, ) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
  • 02/27/2004
  • (#124) ORDER denying 109 Motion for final judgment . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/27/04. cc attys on 2/27/04 (snh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2004)
  • 02/23/2004
  • (#123) ORDER granting 122 Motion to appoint Clyde Siebman as mediator. To the extent counsel's and Mr. Siebman's schedule permits, mediation of the remaining issues in this case should be completed within 30 days. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/18/04. cc: attys 2/23/04 (baf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
  • 02/05/2004
  • (#122) MOTION for appointment of mediator by Southern Building Code Congress International Inc, Peter Veeck. (ttm, ) (Entered: 02/11/2004)
  • 12/17/2003
  • (#121) Minutes Re: hearing on Plfs motion for final judgment by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/03 (Ct rep/ECRO: Libby Crawford) (mrm) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
  • 12/12/2003
  • (#120) Reply by Peter Veeck to response to [113-1] motion for attorney fees (raf) (Entered: 12/15/2003)
  • 11/03/2003
  • (#119) Affidavit by Malla Pollack as to Peter Veeck Re: [113-1] motion for attorney fees (sjs) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
  • 11/05/2003
  • (#118) Fax noticing receipt of document # 116 to attorney Henry H Perritt Jr for movant Henry H Perritt Jr, Robert J Veal for defendant Southern Bldg Code 11/3/03 varied times. (mrm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
  • 10/29/2003
  • (#117) Joint MOTION by Peter Veeck, Southern Bldg Code regarding status conference (sjs) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
  • 11/03/2003
  • (#116) Notice of Hearing: reset motion hearing to 10:00 12/17/03 for [109-1] motion for final judgment (before Judge David Folsom) sent to pty attys of record (mrm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
  • 10/30/2003
  • (#115) Defendant's Supplemental citation of authority and opposition to certain fees claimed by plaintiff (sjs) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
  • 10/24/2003
  • (#114) Response by Southern Bldg Code to [113-1] motion for attorney fees (sjs) (Entered: 10/27/2003)
  • 10/20/2003
  • (#113) MOTION by Peter Veeck for attorney fees (sjs) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
  • 10/02/2003
  • (#112) Fax noticing receipt of document # 111 to attorney Damon Young for movant National Fire, Robert J Veal for defendant Southern Bldg Code 10/2/03 varied times. (mrm) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
  • 10/02/2003
  • (#111) Notice of Hearing: Motion hearing set for 3:00 11/5/03 for [109-1] motion for final judgment sent to pty attys of record (mrm) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
  • 08/11/2003
  • (#110) Response by Southern Bldg Code to [109-1] motion for final judgment (sjs) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
  • 08/05/2003
  • (#109) MOTION by Peter Veeck for final judgment (sjs) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
  • 10/15/2002
  • (#108) ORDER granting [107-1] motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of the petition for certiorari filed in the Supreme Court ( signed by Judge David Folsom ) cc:pltf,attys on 10/16/02 (sjs) (Entered: 10/16/2002)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.