This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2017 at 11:44:34 (UTC).

Vapor Point LLC v. Moorhead

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 Vapor Point LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Moorhead. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-2003

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vapor Point LLC

Defendant

Moorhead

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/03/2015. [270918]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/09/2015.

#2

(#2) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/16/2015 by email. [272883]

#3

(#3) ORDER consolidating appeals (15-1801 Lead with 15-2003 Consolidated); setting briefing schedule Appellees Kenneth Matheson, Keith Nathan and Vapor Point LLC brief is due 11/09/2015.; modifying the official caption. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [273345] [15-1801, 15-2003]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274793]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey III as principal counsel for Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274796]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274824]

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275470]

#11

(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey III as principal counsel for Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275473]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey III as principal counsel for Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275473]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275470]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274824]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey III as principal counsel for Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274796]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc.. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274793]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER consolidating appeals (15-1801 Lead with 15-2003 Consolidated); setting briefing schedule Appellees Kenneth Matheson, Keith Nathan and Vapor Point LLC brief is due 11/09/2015.; modifying the official caption. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [273345] [15-1801, 15-2003]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellees Bryant Hickman, Elliott Moorhead and NanoVapor Fuels Group, Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/16/2015 by email. [272883]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/03/2015. [270918]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.