This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2016 at 07:25:36 (UTC).

Van Ingen v. Ha-Ngoc et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2014 Van Ingen filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Ha-Ngoc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Denise J. Casper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-11672

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen J. Van Ingen

Defendants

Robert D Epstein

Anthony Evnin

Kenneth Weg

Aveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Kenneth Bate

Raju Kucherlapati

Henri A Termeer

Tuan Ha-Ngoc

Robert C. Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert I. Harwood

Attorney at Harwood Feffer LLP

488 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Sean T. Carnathan

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Jeffrey H. Katzenstein

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Joseph P. Calandrelli

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Defendant Attorneys

William H. Paine

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Eric D. Wolkoff

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Jared B. Cohen

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Joseph H. Jolly

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Michael G. Bongiorno

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

Peter A. Spaeth

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#57

#58

#59

#60

#61

#62

#63

#64

#65

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re 62 Redacted Document, filed by Tuan Ha-Ngoc, Henri A Termeer, Anthony Evnin, Robert D Epstein, Kenneth Bate, Aveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Robert C. Young, Kenneth Weg, Raju Kucherlapati, Allowed. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 63 Motion to Unseal January 7, 2015 Hearing Transcript by Aveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kenneth Bate, Robert D Epstein, Anthony Evnin, Tuan Ha-Ngoc, Raju Kucherlapati, Henri A Termeer, Kenneth Weg, Robert C. Young. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Assented to MOTION to Unseal Document January 7, 2015 Hearing Transcript by Aveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kenneth Bate, Robert D Epstein, Anthony Evnin, Tuan Ha-Ngoc, Raju Kucherlapati, Henri A Termeer, Kenneth Weg, Robert C. Young.(Cohen, Jared) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) REDACTION Joint Proposal for Redaction of Documents Filed Under Seal byAveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kenneth Bate, Robert D Epstein, Anthony Evnin, Tuan Ha-Ngoc, Raju Kucherlapati, Henri A Termeer, Kenneth Weg, Robert C. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (D. 50 - Motion), # 2 Exhibit B (D. 51 - Memorandum), # 3 Exhibit C(a) D. 52 - Harwood Dec.), # 4 Exhibit C(b) D. 52 - Harwood Dec.), # 5 Exhibit D (D. 53 - Opposition), # 6 Exhibit E (D. 54 - Reply))(Cohen, Jared) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to Debra Joyce re 57 Notice of Appeal,,, Transcript order form filed in USCA on July 16, 2015. Transcript ordered: 1/7/15 Motion Hearing. Transcript due by 9/14/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Karen J. Van Ingen before First, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) USCA Case Number 15-1783 for 57 Notice of Appeal filed by Karen J. Van Ingen. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 57 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 55 Order on Motion to Vacate, 49 Order Dismissing Case by Karen J. Van Ingen Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5639977 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 7/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. D. 50 to 54 will be unsealed unless by July 21, 2015 the parties indicate what, if any portions, should be redacted. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen J. Van Ingen. Raju Kucherlapati waiver sent on 4/28/2014, answer due 6/27/2014. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen J. Van Ingen. Robert D Epstein waiver sent on 4/28/2014, answer due 6/27/2014. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen J. Van Ingen. Anthony Evnin waiver sent on 4/28/2014, answer due 6/27/2014. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen J. Van Ingen. Kenneth Bate waiver sent on 4/28/2014, answer due 6/27/2014. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen J. Van Ingen. Aveo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/28/2014, answer due 6/27/2014. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (LaFlamme, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT in Support re 2 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint, (to Impound UnRedacted Complaint) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joint MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint, (to Impound UnRedacted Complaint) by Karen J. Van Ingen.(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verfied Sharholder Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Abuse of Control against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4952741 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Karen J. Van Ingen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Carnathan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Calandrelli

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey H. Katzenstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert I. Harwood