This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 14:17:52 (UTC).

Valencell, Inc. v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2016 Valencell, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valencell, Inc.

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Conroy

Jonathan H. Rastegar

Lynne A. Borchers

Jeffrey R. Bragalone

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F. Marshall, III

Craig Daniel Schauer

 

Court Documents

#253

(#253) ORDER denying 219 Motion to Set Aside; denying 233 Motion for Leave to File; granting 235 Motion to refer the matter to Judge Gates to establish a schedule to complete discovery and file motions; denying 240 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/7/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

#74

(#74) ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 40 Motion to Seal Document; granting 48 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/19/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

#127

(#127) ORDER denying 30 Motion to Transfer Case; granting 126 Motion for In-Person Case Management Conference; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.The court will hold the conference on February 28, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. i n courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. The parties are directed to submit proposed revisions to the schedule no later than February 21, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/6/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

#206

(#206) ORDER denying without prejudice 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 110 Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions; denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 151 Motion to Seal Document ; denying without prejudice 202 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

#102

(#102) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/12/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

#164

(#164) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Reconsideration. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion (D.E. 155) seeking a one-weekextension of the deadline in the courts 3 April 2017 Order (D.E. 153 1) applicable to its outsta nding supplemental document production that is not otherwise addressed in the instant Order is ALLOWED. Service of such supplemental document production effected by Valencell by 14 April 2017 shall be deemed timely. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion seeking reconsideration and withdrawal of the requirement in the courts 3 April 2017 Order that Valencell supplement its response to Apples Interrogatory No. 6 relating to Valencells damages claim is DENIED. Valencell shall serve a comple te, supplemental answer to Interrogatory No. 6, with a verificationfor it, as soon as practicable but in no event later than 21 April 2017. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/17/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#253) ORDER denying 219 Motion to Set Aside; denying 233 Motion for Leave to File; granting 235 Motion to refer the matter to Judge Gates to establish a schedule to complete discovery and file motions; denying 240 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/7/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#206) ORDER denying without prejudice 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 110 Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions; denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 151 Motion to Seal Document ; denying without prejudice 202 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#164) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Reconsideration. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion (D.E. 155) seeking a one-weekextension of the deadline in the courts 3 April 2017 Order (D.E. 153 1) applicable to its outsta nding supplemental document production that is not otherwise addressed in the instant Order is ALLOWED. Service of such supplemental document production effected by Valencell by 14 April 2017 shall be deemed timely. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion seeking reconsideration and withdrawal of the requirement in the courts 3 April 2017 Order that Valencell supplement its response to Apples Interrogatory No. 6 relating to Valencells damages claim is DENIED. Valencell shall serve a comple te, supplemental answer to Interrogatory No. 6, with a verificationfor it, as soon as practicable but in no event later than 21 April 2017. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/17/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ORDER denying 30 Motion to Transfer Case; granting 126 Motion for In-Person Case Management Conference; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.The court will hold the conference on February 28, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. i n courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. The parties are directed to submit proposed revisions to the schedule no later than February 21, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/6/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/12/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 40 Motion to Seal Document; granting 48 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/19/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.