This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2016 at 22:56:46 (UTC).

USA v. One Assortment of 93 NFA-Regulated Weapons

Case Summary

On 07/22/2014 USA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against One Assortment of 93 NFA-Regulated Weapons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimants

Randeep Mann

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Trent P Pierce

Sangeeta Mann

Defendant

One Assortment of 93 NFA Regulated Weapons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron Charles McCree

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Michael S. Gordon

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Claimant Attorneys

Robert M. Cearley, Jr.

Attorney at Cearley Law Firm

212 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig

Attorney at Attorney at Law

300 Spring Building, Suite 310

Little Rock, AR 72201-2421

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Trent P Pierce.(tjb) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert M. Cearley, Jr on behalf of Trent P Pierce (tjb) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER of Presence-Hearing Pertaining to the Forfeiture and the Destruction of the Weapons and Other Evidence by Randeep Mann (jap) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) VERIFIED Claim by Trent P Pierce. (sld) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) VERIFIED Claim by Randeep Mann (jap) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Sangeeta Mann.(Rosenzweig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to 1 Verified Complaint In Rem by Randeep Mann.(sld) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VERIFIED CLAIM of Sangeeta Mann (jap) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant and Summons for Arrest of Articles in Rem Issued as to One Assortment of 93 NFA Regulated Weapons. (jap) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against One Assortment of 93 NFA-Regulated Weapons, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Steven Gordon