This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 17:10:36 (UTC).

U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Gillons

Case Summary

On 11/19/2014 U S Commodity Futures Trading Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Gillons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-09262

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission

U.S. Commedity Futures Trading Commission

Defendants

Thomas Gillons

Thomas D Gillons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Terrell

Rosemary C. Hollinger

Scott Robert Williamson

Stephanie Lynn Reinhart

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel John Collins

Jeffrey D. Perconte

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 12/9/2014.The Court enters Consent Order for Preliminary Injunction against defendant Thomas Gillons. Status hearing set for 1/27/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas Gillons by Jeffrey D. Perconte (Perconte, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas Gillons by Daniel John Collins (Collins, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant not in court. Status hearing held on 12/1/2014. Statutory restraining order is extended until 12/11/2014. Status hearing set for 12/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. before Judge Leinenweber. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Commedity Futures Trading Commission as to Thomas Gillons on 11/23/2014, answer due 12/15/2014. (Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATUTORY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/19/2014. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Order entered 11/19/2014 14 is stricken as entered in clerical error. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting motion for expedited discovery signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/19/2014. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Removed per court order dated 11/19/2014 (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Order entered 11/19/2014 12 is stricken as entered in clerical error. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission to expedite discovery (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission in support of motion for preliminary injunction 7 , motion for temporary restraining order 6 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Melissa Glasbrenner, # 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Michael Cavalli)(Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission for preliminary injunction (Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission for temporary restraining order Statutory Restraining Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Statutory Order)(Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission by Rosemary C. Hollinger (Hollinger, Rosemary) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission by Scott Robert Williamson (Williamson, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission by David A. Terrell (Terrell, David) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission by Stephanie Lynn Reinhart (Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Equitable Relief and Penalties Under the Commodity Exchange Act filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission; (Reinhart, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less