This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 05:59:34 (UTC).

URL PHARMA, INC. et al v. RECKITT BENCKISER INC.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2015 URL PHARMA, INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against RECKITT BENCKISER INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00505

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Judge

CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.

UNITED RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.

URL PHARMA, INC.

Defendant

RECKITT BENCKISER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANIEL P. SHAPIRO

JOHN J. GROGAN

KRISTINA Y. LIU

MATTHEW M. HOLUB

STEPHEN P. BENSON

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD L. BAZELON

BERNICE K. LEBER

MICHAEL P. MCMAHAN

MICHAEL A. SHAPIRO

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#25

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

#33

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/26/2015
View Court Documents

(#33) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW M. HOLUB on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HOLUB, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2015
View Court Documents

(#32) ORDER THAT DEFT RECKITT BENCKISER, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 8(a) & 12(b)(6) (DOC. 20), IS DENIED AS TO MUTUAL'S ANTITRUST AND STATE LAW CLAIMS; RECKITT'S MOTION IS DENIED AS TO MUTUAL'S CLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO PERRIGO'S 600 MG ERG FORMULATION OF RECKITT'S ERG PRODUCT; RECKITT'S MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO MUTUAL'S CLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT RELATING TO ALL OTHER THIRD-PARTY FORMULATIONS OF RECKITT'S MUCINEX PRODUCT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/25/15. 8/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2015
View Court Documents

(#31) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/25/15. 8/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2015
View Court Documents

(#30) MUTUAL'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR A RULE 16 (a)CONFERENCE. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2015
View Court Documents

(#29) ORDER THAT MUTUAL'S REQUEST FOR A RULE 16(a) CONFERENCE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/8/15. 6/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2015
View Court Documents

(#28) ORDER TYAT MUTUAL'S REQUEST TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR A RULE 16 (a) CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/8/15. 6/9/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2015
View Court Documents

(#27) MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Request for a Rule 16(a) Conference filed by MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., URAL PHARMA, INC., UNITED RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC. Exhibit A Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum in Support of its Request for a Rule16(a) Conference, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(GROGAN, JOHN) Modified on 6/2/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/01/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2015
View Court Documents

(#26) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for a Rule 16(a) Conference re 25 Praecipe/Request, by RECKITT BENCKISER INC.. (BAZELON, RICHARD) Modified on 5/29/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/28/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2015
View Court Documents

(#25) REQUEST for a Rule 16(a) Conference by MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., URAL PHARMA, INC., UNITED RESEARHC LABORATORIES, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(GROGAN, JOHN) Modified on 5/13/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2015
View Court Documents

(#24) REPLY Memorandum of Law in Further Support re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rules 8(a) and 12(b)(6) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by RECKITT BENCKISER INC.. (BAZELON, RICHARD) Modified on 5/8/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/07/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
03/04/2015
View Court Documents

(#10) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF BERNICE K. LEBER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/4/15.3/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2015
View Court Documents

(#9) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MICHAEL P. MCMAHAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/4/15.3/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2015
View Court Documents

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFT RECKITT BENCKISER INC. HAS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO & INCLUDING 4/6/2015. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/4/15. 3/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2015
View Court Documents

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Application for Michael P. McMahan filed by RECKITT BENCKISER INC..Certificate of Service.(SHAPIRO, MICHAEL) (Filing fee paid on 3/3/15, #PPE117058) Modified on 3/4/2015 (kw, ). (Entered: 03/02/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2015
View Court Documents

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Application for Bernice K. Leber filed by RECKITT BENCKISER INC..Certificate of Service.(SHAPIRO, MICHAEL) (Filing fee paid on 3/3/15, #PPE117058) Modified on 3/4/2015 (kw, ). (Entered: 03/02/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015
View Court Documents

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Reckitt Benckiser USA (2013) LLC and Reckitt Benckiser Group plc by RECKITT BENCKISER INC..(SHAPIRO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015
View Court Documents

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. BAZELON on behalf of RECKITT BENCKISER INC. with Certificate of Service(BAZELON, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015
View Court Documents

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. SHAPIRO on behalf of RECKITT BENCKISER INC. with Certificate of Service(SHAPIRO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2015
View Court Documents

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., UNITED RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC., URL PHARMA, INC..(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2015
View Court Documents

(#1) COMPLAINT against RECKITT BENCKISER INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 115422.), filed by URL PHARMA, INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., UNITED RESEARCH LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Track Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Designation Form, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less