This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2019 at 17:27:44 (UTC).

Walton et al v. AT&T Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2015 Walton filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-03653

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wendell Walton

Marilyn Dito

Anthony Ureta

Michael Mantonya

Defendants

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Relic Sun

Attorney at Outten and Golden LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 38Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jason C Marsili

Attorney at Posner and Rosen LLP

3600 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Deirdre A Aaron

Attorney at Outten & Golden LLP

685 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Jahan C. Sagafi

One California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael N Litrownik

Attorney at Outten and Golden LLP

685 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Jason C Marsili,

Attorney at Posner and Rosen LLP

3600 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Brianna Marie Primozic,

Attorney at Posner and Rosen LLP

3600 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Roy Kaufman

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Thomas Campbell

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Paul Berkowitz

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

224 #3

Exhibit 3

224 #2

Exhibit 2

224 #1

Exhibit 1

#224

(#224) Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of #222 Notice (Other) Post-Distribution Accounting filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #222 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#223

(#223) Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi in Support of #222 Notice (Other) Post-Distribution Accounting filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Related document(s) #222 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#222

(#222) NOTICE by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton Post-Distribution Accounting (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#221

(#221) ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/14/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

#220

(#220) Proposed Order re #207 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement and Final Judgment by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 2/9/2018) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

#207

(#217) Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi in Support of #207 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion (Supplemental Declaration) filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Related document(s) #207 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Anthony Ureta of Filing of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9747175.). Filed byAnthony Ureta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

584 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of #222 Notice (Other) Post-Distribution Accounting filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #222 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#223) Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi in Support of #222 Notice (Other) Post-Distribution Accounting filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Related document(s) #222 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) NOTICE by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton Post-Distribution Accounting (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#221) ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/14/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#220) Proposed Order re #207 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement and Final Judgment by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 2/9/2018) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#219) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2018 re #207 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton, #208 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Michael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. The Court notes on the record that there are no objectors of the proposed settlement in the courtroom today. The Court will approve the settlement. FTR Time: 10:26- 10:30. Plaintiff Attorney: Relic Sun and Jahan Sagafi. Defendant Attorney: Paul Berkowitz. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#218) Supplemental Brief Regarding Notice to PAGA Representative Group and Updated Settlement Administration Costs filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#217) Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi in Support of #207 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion (Supplemental Declaration) filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Related document(s) #207 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#216) Supplemental Brief re #215 Order filed byMichael Mantonya, Wendell Walton. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#215) ORDER RE FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/29/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2015
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AT&T Services, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Anthony Ureta of Filing of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9747175.). Filed byAnthony Ureta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less