This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:46:52 (UTC).

United States of America v. Real Property Located at 8364 Shintaffer Road, Blaine, WA 98230

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Real Property Located at 8364 Shintaffer Road, Blaine, WA 98230. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00976

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Clifford D Robinson

Pamela Allison Robinson

Defendants

Real Property Located at 8364 Shintaffer Road, Blaine, WA 98230

Chicago Title Ins. Company

1200 - 6Th Avenue, Suite 620

Seattle, WA 98101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Edward Cohen

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

Michelle D. Jensen

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

700 Stewart Street, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101

Claimant Attorneys

William G. Knudsen

119 N Commercial St, Ste 1410

Bellingham, WA 98225

William J. Johnston

401 Central Ave

Bellingham, WA 98225

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas P Larkin, II

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

1200 6Th Avenue, Ste 620

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel Allen Womac

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

1200 6Th Avenue, Ste 620

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem with Supporting Affidavit) against defendant(s) Real Property Located at 8364 Shintaffer Road, Blaine, WA 98230, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet for Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem)(Cohen, Richard) (Fee Waived) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER Regarding Joint Status Report by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by August 28, 2015.(LMK) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Attorney William G. Knudsen added to party CLIFFORD D ROBINSON(pty:clm) by CLIFFORD D ROBINSON.(Knudsen, William) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#6

(#6) CLAIM Real Property Interest by CLIFFORD D ROBINSON. (Knudsen, William) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney William J. Johnston added to party pamela allison Robinson(pty:clm) by pamela allison Robinson.(Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William J. Johnston on behalf of Claimant pamela allison Robinson. (Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

#9

(#9) CLAIM by pamela allison Robinson. (Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

#10

(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2016, Motions due by 4/1/2016, Discovery completed by 5/2/2016, Dispositive motions due by 6/9/2016, Motions in Limine due by 8/25/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2016, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/12/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/12/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Allen Womac on behalf of Defendant Chicago Title Ins. Company. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas P Larkin, II on behalf of Defendant Chicago Title Ins. Company. (Larkin, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle D. Jensen on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Jensen, Michelle) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle D. Jensen on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Jensen, Michelle) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas P Larkin, II on behalf of Defendant Chicago Title Ins. Company. (Larkin, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Allen Womac on behalf of Defendant Chicago Title Ins. Company. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DECLARATION of Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2016, Motions due by 4/1/2016, Discovery completed by 5/2/2016, Dispositive motions due by 6/9/2016, Motions in Limine due by 8/25/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2016, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/12/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/12/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLAIM by pamela allison Robinson. (Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William J. Johnston on behalf of Claimant pamela allison Robinson. (Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney William J. Johnston added to party pamela allison Robinson(pty:clm) by pamela allison Robinson.(Johnston, William) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM Real Property Interest by CLIFFORD D ROBINSON. (Knudsen, William) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Attorney William G. Knudsen added to party CLIFFORD D ROBINSON(pty:clm) by CLIFFORD D ROBINSON.(Knudsen, William) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Regarding Joint Status Report by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by August 28, 2015.(LMK) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem with Supporting Affidavit) against defendant(s) Real Property Located at 8364 Shintaffer Road, Blaine, WA 98230, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet for Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem)(Cohen, Richard) (Fee Waived) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less