This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 23:21:47 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AB ELECTROLUX et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AB ELECTROLUX. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Defendants

ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AB ELECTROLUX

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

TOLL BROS., INC.

LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.

FACTORY BUILDER STORES, INC.

FIRST TEXAS HOMES, INC.

ALMO CORPORATION

JB Hunt

Lowell, AR 72745

D.R. HORTON INC.

NATIONAL COURT ADMINISTRATION OF THE REPUBLIC OF KOREA

FERGUSON ENTERPRISE, INC.

BOZZUTO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

BSH HOME APPLIANCES CORPORATION

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Intervenors

HAIER AMERICA TRADING, LLC

GREGG APPLIANCES, INC.

LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah L. Thompson

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant Street, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2514

Debra R. Belott

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Paula W. Render

Attorney at JONES DAY

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Devin A. Winklosky

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant Street, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Joe Sims

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Matthew Aaron Tabas

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Paul H. Friedman

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

1900 K Street, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Steven Andrew Engel

Attorney at DECHERT, LLP

1900 K Street, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Interested Party Attorneys

James R. Lindley

Attorney at BUCK KEENAN LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Siobhan K. Cole

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James Ian Serota

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Intervenor Attorneys

Frank S. Swain

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP

1050 K Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20001

William H. Stallings

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Elaine Ewing

Attorney at CLEARY, GOTTLIEB, STEEN & HAMILTON

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, 9000

Washington, DC 20006-1801

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey Grant Vernon

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Kenneth M Vorrasi

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

1500 K Street, N.W., Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Ethan Glass

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street, Nw, Room 4000

Washington, DC 20001

Kelsey Walter Shannon

Attorney at UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street, Nw, Ste. 4000

Washington, DC 20530

Mark Harris Hamer

Attorney at UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street, Nw, Suite 4000

Washington, DC 20530

Adam Colin Speegle

Attorney at UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th Street, Nw, Suite 4000

Washington, DC 20001

53 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. and GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T. Denis on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Denis, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY waiver sent on 7/1/2015, answer due 8/30/2015. (Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Hashim M. Mooppan on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Mooppan, Hashim) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen A. Lejnieks on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Lejnieks, Kristen) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Demitrack, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 901 Lakeside Avenue, North Point, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. Phone No. - 216-586-3939. Fax No. - 216-579-0212 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4160909. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas Demitrack in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael R. Shumaker, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 51 Louisiana Ave., NW, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-879-3939. Fax No. - 202-626-1700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4160925. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael R. Shumaker in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

#370

(#370) SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DX-0394)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#371

(#371) NOTICE of Rebuttal Witnesses by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/05/2015)

#372

(#372) NOTICE of Termination of Stock and Asset Purchase Agreement by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Falls, Craig) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#373

(#373) Unopposed MOTION to File Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A (Public Redacted Pretrial Brief))(Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#374

(#374) STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#375

(#375) MOTION for Leave to File Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Brief by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#376

(#376) NOTICE of Filing of Public Redacted Pretrial Brief by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#377

(#377) REDACTED DOCUMENT- Public Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 188) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#378

(#378) REDACTED DOCUMENT- Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Memorandum (Dkt. No. 224) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

403 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#378) REDACTED DOCUMENT- Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Memorandum (Dkt. No. 224) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#377) REDACTED DOCUMENT- Public Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 188) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#376) NOTICE of Filing of Public Redacted Pretrial Brief by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#375) MOTION for Leave to File Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Brief by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#374) STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#373) Unopposed MOTION to File Public Redacted Version of Pretrial Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A (Public Redacted Pretrial Brief))(Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#372) NOTICE of Termination of Stock and Asset Purchase Agreement by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Falls, Craig) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#371) NOTICE of Rebuttal Witnesses by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Shannon, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#370) SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DX-0394)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#369) NOTICE of Public Filing of Exhibits Admitted on December 4, 2015 by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Majoras, John) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
358 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paula W. Render, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 77 West Wacker Drive Chicago, IL 60601. Phone No. - 312-269-1555. Fax No. - 312-782-8585 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4160950. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Paula W. Render in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael R. Shumaker, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 51 Louisiana Ave., NW, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-879-3939. Fax No. - 202-626-1700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4160925. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael R. Shumaker in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Demitrack, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 901 Lakeside Avenue, North Point, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. Phone No. - 216-586-3939. Fax No. - 216-579-0212 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4160909. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas Demitrack in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen A. Lejnieks on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Lejnieks, Kristen) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Hashim M. Mooppan on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Mooppan, Hashim) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of AB ELECTROLUX, ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Majoras, John) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY waiver sent on 7/1/2015, answer due 8/30/2015. (Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T. Denis on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Denis, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. and GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Glass, Ethan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less