This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 21:38:32 (UTC).

United States of America et al v. Raff & Becker, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 United States of America filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Raff Becker, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-04393

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William J. Rold

United States Of America

Defendants

Raff & Becker, L.L.P.

Eric T. Schneiderman

State of New York

Colleen C. Gardner

Leonard D. Polletta

Robert L. Becker

Peter M. Rivera

Andrew M. Cuomo

M. Patricia Smith

David A. Raff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven A Rosen

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven A. Rosen

271 Madison Avenue, Suite 1404

New York, NY 10017

Jane Becker

Attorney at Law Offices of Jane Becker Whitaker

Po Box 9023914

San Juan, PR 00902

Richard K. Hayes

Defendant Attorneys

Mark K. Anesh

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith, LLP.

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

Philip John Furia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

Brian Joseph Capitummino

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP (NYC)

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Adam Samuel Lurie

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft, LLC

700 6Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Howard Robert Hawkins, Jr

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP (NYC)

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Garrett Joseph Coyle

Andrew Hodge Meier

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General (NYC)

120 Broadway 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10271

Hanan B. Kolko

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C(NYC)

1350 Broadway, Suite 501

New York, NY 10018

Melissa S. Woods

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C(NYC)

1350 Broadway, Suite 501

New York, NY 10018

Jessica Drangel Ochs

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C(NYC)

1350 Broadway, Suite 501

New York, NY 10018

Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

600 Fifth Avenue 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Andrew G. Celli

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

75 Rockefeller Plaza, 20Th Flr.

New York, NY 10019

Jennifer Michelle Keighley

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinkerhoff & Abady, LLP

75 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#174

(#174) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Andrew H. Meier, who is listed on the electronic docket of the above-captioned action as an attorney for Governor Andrew M. Cuomo, M. Patricia Smith, and Leonard D. Polletta is no longer employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws from this action and requests that his appearance herein be terminated, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. Attorney Andrew Hodge Meier terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/20/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#2

(#2) STIPULATION AND ORDER re extension to remain sealed to 8/28/12 filed by United States of America. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/07/2012)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED filed by William J. Rold. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 09/04/2012)

#175

(#175) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Garrett J. Coyle, who is listed on the electronic docket of the above-captioned action as an attorney for the State of New York, is no longer employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws from this action and requests that his appearance herein be terminated, and as further set forth in this Order. Attorney Garrett Joseph Coyle terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/20/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#169

(#169) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel in the above-captioned matter are directed to appear in courtroom 12A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 on October 22, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. for oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [dkt. no. 124] SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 10/22/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#168

(#168) DECLARATION of Jessica Drangel Ochs re: 167 MOTION for Jessica Drangel Ochs to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Leonard D. Polletta. (Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#170

(#170) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jane Becker dated 9/9/2015. Document filed by William J. Rold.(Becker, Jane) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#6

(#6) Letter to Judge Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky from AAG Peguese in response to 5 . (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/13/2012)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL re 2 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/31/2012. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/07/2012)

#172

(#172) NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by Andrew M. Cuomo, Leonard D. Polletta, M. Patricia Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supporting Withdrawal)(Berg, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for U.S. to intervene until Nov. 30, 2012. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/22/2012. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 08/23/2012)

#173

(#173) ORDER granting 170 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jane Becker dated 9/9/2015. Document filed by William J. Rold. Argument is adjourned to October 28, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. So ordered. (Oral Argument set for 10/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/10/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

#4

(#4) Letter to Court from Marvin C. Peguese, Assistant Attorney General, regarding inadvertent disclosure. (Gapinski, Michele) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/29/2012)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by William J. Rold, United States of America, State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2011)

#176

(#176) SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for October 28, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to January 6, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Oral Argument set for 1/6/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/22/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Hearing re 4 Letter by William J. Rold. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/11/2012)

#7

(#7) Letter to Judge Irizarry from AAG Peguese identifying the persons who received copy/notice of sealed complaint. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/27/2012)

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#176) SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for October 28, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to January 6, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Oral Argument set for 1/6/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/22/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Garrett J. Coyle, who is listed on the electronic docket of the above-captioned action as an attorney for the State of New York, is no longer employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws from this action and requests that his appearance herein be terminated, and as further set forth in this Order. Attorney Garrett Joseph Coyle terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/20/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#174) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Andrew H. Meier, who is listed on the electronic docket of the above-captioned action as an attorney for Governor Andrew M. Cuomo, M. Patricia Smith, and Leonard D. Polletta is no longer employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws from this action and requests that his appearance herein be terminated, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. Attorney Andrew Hodge Meier terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/20/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#173) ORDER granting 170 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jane Becker dated 9/9/2015. Document filed by William J. Rold. Argument is adjourned to October 28, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. So ordered. (Oral Argument set for 10/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/10/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#172) NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by Andrew M. Cuomo, Leonard D. Polletta, M. Patricia Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supporting Withdrawal)(Berg, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by State Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supporting Withdrawal)(Berg, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#170) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jane Becker dated 9/9/2015. Document filed by William J. Rold.(Becker, Jane) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#169) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel in the above-captioned matter are directed to appear in courtroom 12A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 on October 22, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. for oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [dkt. no. 124] SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 10/22/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#168) DECLARATION of Jessica Drangel Ochs re: 167 MOTION for Jessica Drangel Ochs to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Leonard D. Polletta. (Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#167) MOTION for Jessica Drangel Ochs to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Leonard D. Polletta.(Ochs, Jessica) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J. Rold. David A. Raff served on 8/30/2012, answer due 9/20/2012. (Becker, Jane) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 09/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED filed by William J. Rold. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 09/04/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for U.S. to intervene until Nov. 30, 2012. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/22/2012. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter to Judge Irizarry from AAG Peguese identifying the persons who received copy/notice of sealed complaint. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to Judge Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky from AAG Peguese in response to 5 . (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Hearing re 4 Letter by William J. Rold. (Carosella, Christy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 07/11/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter to Court from Marvin C. Peguese, Assistant Attorney General, regarding inadvertent disclosure. (Gapinski, Michele) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL re 2 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/31/2012. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STIPULATION AND ORDER re extension to remain sealed to 8/28/12 filed by United States of America. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 06/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by William J. Rold, United States of America, State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/19/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.