This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2016 at 21:27:57 (UTC).

United States of America et al v. Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2014 United States of America filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Kathleen M. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:14-CV-61301

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Kathleen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jack Carrel

State of Florida

Shawn Loftis

Mauricio Ferrer

United States of America

Defendant

Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey M. Preston

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

3 Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Diana Leigh Martin

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll, PLLC

2925 Pga Blvd., Suite 200

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Gary L. Azorsky

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

3 Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Geoffrey R. Kaiser

Attorney at Kaiser Law Firm, PLLC

926 Rxr Plaza

Unionable, NY 11556

James Paul Gitkin

Attorney at Salpeter Gitkin, LLP

One East Broward Blvd., Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Raymond M. Sarola

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

3 Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Christopher Ellis Gottfried

Attorney at O'Quinn Stumphauzer & Sloman PL

1 Se 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey Henry Sloman

Attorney at O'Quinn Stumphauzer & Sloman, P.L.

One Se Third Avenue, Suite 1820

Miami, FL 33131

Theodore Jon Leopold

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

2925 Pga Boulevard, Suite 200

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Stephen H. Thomas, Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Susan Torres

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 N.E. 4Th Street, Third Floor

Miami, FL 33132

Elisa Castrolugo

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 N.E. 4Th Street

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey David Marcus

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum, LLP

One Biscayne Tower - Suite 1750, 2 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey Adam Neiman

Attorney at Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum LLP

100 Southeast Third Avenue, Suite 805

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Marc E. Masters

Attorney at Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, et al

1875 Century Park East, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Mitchell A. Kamin

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3044

Paul S. Chan

Attorney at Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, et al

1875 Century Park East, 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Edward Dickerson

Attorney at Dickerson Law Group PA

780 Fifth Avenue South, Suite 200

Naples, FL 34102

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#81

#83

#84

#85

#88

#89

#90

#91

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER denying 88 Motion for Leave to File a Sue-Reply. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/2/2015. (jua) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) PAPERLESS ORDER granting 86 Motion to Seal. The information identified in the motion shall be maintained under seal until one year following the conclusion of the case. Before that time, Defendant shall move to dispose of the sealed filing to protect any sensitive information. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/1/2015. (cck) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed by Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Replies due by 10/13/2015. (Neiman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint by Jack Carrel, Mauricio Ferrer, Shawn Loftis, State of Florida, United States of America. (Martin, Diana) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Aids Healthcare Foundation's Unopposed MOTION to File Reply Memorandum in Supposrt of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mg) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Dismiss 59 Amended Complaint, filed by Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Neiman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey David Marcus (Marcus, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) OMNIBUS ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Motion to Dismiss, 71 Unopposed Motion to File Motion to Dismiss Under Seal, 78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 81 Motion to File Response In Opposition to AHF's Motion to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint Under Seal. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before September 28, 2015 and shall not exceed 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/16/2015. (See Order for full details) (nc) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION to File Response in Opposition to AHF's Motion to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint Under Seal. (ra) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss ( Responses due by 10/1/2015), MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Marcus, Jeffrey) Modified relief on 9/15/2015 (jua). (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jack Carrel, Mauricio Ferrer, Shawn Loftis, State of Florida, United States of America re 14 Amended Complaint, filed by Shawn Loftis, Jack Carrel, United States of America, Mauricio Ferrer, State of Florida (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Leopold, Theodore) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aids Healthcare Foundation, Inc., filed by United States of America, Jack Carrel, Shawn Loftis, State of Florida, Mauricio Ferrer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9(Leopold, Theodore)(Attachment 9 replaced per DE 19 on 4/16/2015) (jua). (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing Case pursuant to 11 Order. (nc) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Granting 10 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by State of Florida. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/11/2015. (See Order for full details) (nc) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting 9 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/11/2015. (See Order for full details) (nc) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by State of Florida. Attorney Stephen H. Thomas, Jr added to party State of Florida(pty:pla). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nc) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nc) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/4/2014 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000005286 (mg) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (mg) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by United States of America, Jack Carrel, Shawn Loftis, State of Florida, Mauricio Ferrer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E. Dickerson