This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 18:44:15 (UTC).

United International Insurance Company v. Bank of Nova Scotia, et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 United International Insurance Company filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank of Nova Scotia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-05957

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United International Insurance Company

Defendants

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Jefferies LLC

Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.

SG Americas Securities, LLC

Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency

Bank of Nova Scotia

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Goldman, Sachs & Co.

RBS Securities Inc.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.

HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.

BMO Capital Markets Corp.

UBS Securities LLC

TD Securities (USA) LLC

BNP Paribas Securities Corp.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jayne Arnold Goldstein

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Ave, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Jay B. Kasner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Tobias B. Jacoby

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

David C. Esseks

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Omari Largos Royter Mason

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

Thomas C. Rice

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Patrick Joseph Campbell

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David J. Woll

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Susannah Providence Torpey

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Penny Shane

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Greg Donald Andres

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David Harold Braff

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew Alexander Schwartz

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

David A. Paul

Attorney at Cantor Fitzgerald

110 East 59Th Street

New York, NY 10022

William J. Kolasky

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP (DC)

1775 I Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Jennifer Kennedy Park

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Edward Nathaniel Moss

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP(NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Susanna Michele Buergel

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Jerome Steven Fortinsky

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP (NY)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Mark David Villaverde

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

54 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11214503)Document filed by United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:15-cv-5807-PGG. Document filed by United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#163

(#163) MOTION for Jayne Arnold Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and 3 Certificates of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Jayne) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#164

(#164) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciola dated 09/25/2015 re: Informing the judge that a JPML Motion to Transfer was filed on 9/24/2015 which nay impact pending litigation dates including due date of 10/1/2015 for lead plaintiff motions. Document filed by State-Boston Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Asciolla, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#165

(#165) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Y. Sperling dated 9/25/2015 re: 9/3/2015 consolidation order, and Court's 9/24/2015 request for parties' positions on consolidation, on behalf of all Defendants. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#166

(#166) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett dated September 25, 2015 re: Whether JPML Motion to Transfer Should Impact Lead Counsel Briefing Deadlines. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#167

(#167) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 163 Motion for Jayne Arnold Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/25/2015) (ama) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#168

(#168) MOTION for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11445198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolasky, William) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#169

(#169) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayne Arnold Goldstein on behalf of United International Insurance Company. (Goldstein, Jayne) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#170

(#170) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 168 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#171

(#171) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#170) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 168 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#169) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayne Arnold Goldstein on behalf of United International Insurance Company. (Goldstein, Jayne) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#168) MOTION for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11445198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolasky, William) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#167) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 163 Motion for Jayne Arnold Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/25/2015) (ama) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#166) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett dated September 25, 2015 re: Whether JPML Motion to Transfer Should Impact Lead Counsel Briefing Deadlines. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#165) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Y. Sperling dated 9/25/2015 re: 9/3/2015 consolidation order, and Court's 9/24/2015 request for parties' positions on consolidation, on behalf of all Defendants. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#164) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciola dated 09/25/2015 re: Informing the judge that a JPML Motion to Transfer was filed on 9/24/2015 which nay impact pending litigation dates including due date of 10/1/2015 for lead plaintiff motions. Document filed by State-Boston Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Asciolla, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#163) MOTION for Jayne Arnold Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and 3 Certificates of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Jayne) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#162) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jayne Arnold Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Pennsylvania Supreme Court Good Standing Certificate, # 2 Supplement Florida Supreme Court Good Standing Certificate, # 3 Supplement Illinois Supreme Court Good Standing Certificate)(Goldstein, Jayne) Modified on 9/24/2015 (sdi). (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commerz Markets LLC, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:15-cv-5807-PGG. Document filed by United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11214503)Document filed by United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less