This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 15:29:52 (UTC).

Unicolors Inc v. Charlotte Russe, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2015 Unicolors Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Charlotte Russe, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh and Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01283

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh

Judge

Judge Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unicolors Inc

Defendants

A'Gaci LLC

AMICI Accessories Ltd.

YM LLC USA

Does

Rainbow USA Inc

Charlotte Russe, Inc.

PG Wear Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Scott P Shaw

Attorney at Call and Jensen PC

610 Newport Center Drive Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Samuel G Brooks

Attorney at Call and Jensen APC

610 Newport Center Drive Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Steven Erick Lauridsen

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Brian K Brookey

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15255331 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Unicolors Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix "Schedule A")(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants A'Gaci LLC, AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., PG Wear Corp., Rainbow USA Inc, YM LLC USA. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc, upon Defendant A'Gaci LLC served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jon S. Won- Authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's claims 24 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nader Pazirandeh, # 2 Declaration of Scott Burroughs, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Non-Opposition to Motion, 30 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nader Pazirandeh)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

#32

(#32) REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's claims 24 filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. (Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#33

(#33) MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt.No. 24, filed April 24, 2015) 24 Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS the motion for summary judgment in its entirety. To the extent Unicolors requests an order denying costs or attorneys fees, those requests are denied without prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pj) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#34

(#34) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 copy of Minute order) (pj) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#35

(#35) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Samuel G. Brooks, # 3 Exhibit 1-3, # 4 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#36

(#36) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (1))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#37

(#37) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#38

(#38) MINUTES OF DEFT'S CHARLOTTE RUSSE, INC. AMICI ACCESSORIES, LTD & RAINBOW USA, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court at this time will not address sanctions. As stated on the record, the parties agree to the dispute regarding attorneys fees only, and acknowledge the Settlement Agreement as binding. Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted. The plaintiff will issue a check to the defendant within seven days of this hearing. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (lom) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MINUTES OF DEFT'S CHARLOTTE RUSSE, INC. AMICI ACCESSORIES, LTD & RAINBOW USA, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court at this time will not address sanctions. As stated on the record, the parties agree to the dispute regarding attorneys fees only, and acknowledge the Settlement Agreement as binding. Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted. The plaintiff will issue a check to the defendant within seven days of this hearing. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (lom) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS 35 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (1))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Samuel G. Brooks, # 3 Exhibit 1-3, # 4 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 copy of Minute order) (pj) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt.No. 24, filed April 24, 2015) 24 Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS the motion for summary judgment in its entirety. To the extent Unicolors requests an order denying costs or attorneys fees, those requests are denied without prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pj) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's claims 24 filed by Defendants AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Rainbow USA Inc. (Brooks, Samuel) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Non-Opposition to Motion, 30 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nader Pazirandeh)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's claims 24 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nader Pazirandeh, # 2 Declaration of Scott Burroughs, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Answer filed 4/24/2015 25 . The document is stricken. Plaintiff filed Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant, YM LLC USA on 04/23/2015 23 . (gk) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc, upon Defendant A'Gaci LLC served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jon S. Won- Authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants A'Gaci LLC, AMICI Accessories Ltd., Charlotte Russe, Inc., PG Wear Corp., Rainbow USA Inc, YM LLC USA. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix "Schedule A")(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15255331 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Unicolors Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less