This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 06:00:08 (UTC).

Tyler v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 Tyler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:16-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Tyler

Defendants

Nomac Drilling, LLC

Seventy Seven Energy, Inc

Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC

Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul T. Oven

Attorney at Dougherty Leventhal & Price, LLP

75 Glenmaura National Blvd.

Moosic, PA 18507

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Leahey

Attorney at Jackson Kelly PLLC

3 Gateway Ctr., 401 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1500

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kevin E. Monastra

Attorney at Bonner, Kiernan, Trebach & Crociata, LLP

Ten Penn Center, Suite 770, 1801 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James F. Lynn

Attorney at Bonner Kiernan Trebach & Crociata

Ten Penn Center, Suite 770, 1801 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: GRANTING the Parties' Joint 12 Motion to Extend Time' EXTENDING all Court deadlines by 45 days. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/14/16.(km) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC, Nomac Drilling, LLC, Seventy Seven Energy, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Leahey, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Leahey on behalf of Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC, Nomac Drilling, LLC, Seventy Seven Energy, Inc (Leahey, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC.(Lynn, James) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Monastra.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/26/2016. (ch1) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Lynn, James) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by James F. Lynn on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC Attorney Kevin Monastra is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3685253.. (Lynn, James) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Lynn on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC (Lynn, James) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Tyler. Seventy Seven Energy, Inc waiver sent on 1/27/2016, answer due 3/28/2016. (Oven, Paul) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Tyler. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2016, answer due 3/21/2016. (Oven, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Court to Counsel - Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/14/16. (km) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC, Nomac Drilling, LLC, Seventy Seven Energy, Inc and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (ch1) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC, Nomac Drilling, LLC, Seventy Seven Energy, Inc ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 3646928), filed by Michael Tyler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch1) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT PLAINS OILFIELD RENTAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Seventy Seven Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nomac Drilling LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC is a litigant