This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2016 at 04:58:19 (UTC).

TVIIM, LLC v. McAfee, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 TVIIM, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against McAfee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-1562

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TVIIM, LLC

Defendant

McAfee, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Joseph J. Mueller as principal counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312860]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312862]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312863]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Nina S. Tallon as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312865]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Sarah B. Petty as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312866]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Michael Wolin as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312871]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313364]

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313367]

#16

(#16) Entry of appearance for Jeff Grant as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313421]

#17

(#17) Entry of appearance for John Shaeffer as principal counsel for. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313422]

#18

(#18) Entry of appearance for William Rudy as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313424]

#19

(#19) Entry of appearance for Richard W. O'Neill as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2016 by email. [321058]

#20

(#20) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2016 by email. [321423]

#21

(#21) TENDERED from Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 04/08/2016 by email. [325204]

#22

(#22) BRIEF FILED for Appellant TVIIM, LLC [21]. Number of Pages: 88. Service: 04/08/2016 by email. Pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 31(b), filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 04/13/2016. Appellee McAfee, Inc. brief is due 05/23/2016. [325238]

#0130739974

(#0130739974) Entry of appearance for John Shaeffer as principal counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313370]

#0130739991

(#0130739991) Entry of appearance for William Rudy as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313383]

#0130739999

(#0130739999) Entry of appearance for Jeff Grant as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313386]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130739999) Entry of appearance for Jeff Grant as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313386]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130739991) Entry of appearance for William Rudy as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313383]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130739974) Entry of appearance for John Shaeffer as principal counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313370]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) BRIEF FILED for Appellant TVIIM, LLC [21]. Number of Pages: 88. Service: 04/08/2016 by email. Pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 31(b), filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 04/13/2016. Appellee McAfee, Inc. brief is due 05/23/2016. [325238]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TENDERED from Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 04/08/2016 by email. [325204]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2016 by email. [321423]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Entry of appearance for Richard W. O'Neill as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 03/23/2016 by email. [321058]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Entry of appearance for William Rudy as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313424]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Entry of appearance for John Shaeffer as principal counsel for. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313422]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Entry of appearance for Jeff Grant as of counsel for Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313421]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313367]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant TVIIM, LLC. Service: 02/23/2016 by email. [313364]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Michael Wolin as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312871]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Sarah B. Petty as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312866]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Nina S. Tallon as of counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312865]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312863]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312862]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Joseph J. Mueller as principal counsel for Appellee McAfee, Inc.. Service: 02/22/2016 by email. [312860]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/08/2016. [309380]Entry of Appearance due 02/22/2016. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/22/2016. Docketing Statement due 02/22/2016. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 04/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less