This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:19:17 (UTC).

Turn IP LLC v. Alliance Bank

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 Turn IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alliance Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge William C. Bryson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge William C. Bryson

 

Party Details

Defendants

U.S. Bancorp

U.S. Bancorp National Association

Alliance Bank

Consolidated Defendants

Prosperity Bank

Regions Financial Corp.

First United Bank and Trust Company

US Bancorp Asset Management Inc.

PlainsCapital Bank

TD Bank, N.A.

BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc.

HSBC North America Holdings Inc.

First Republic Bank

Bank of Texas

Austin Bank National Association

Amegy Bank National Association

Texas Bank and Trust Company

Huntington State Bank

First National Bank of Omaha

Consolidated Counter Defendant

Turn IP LLC

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

J Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman - Austin

301 Congress Ave., Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Kevin Lowell Daffer

Attorney at Matheson Keys Daffer & Kordzik PLLC

7004 Bee Cave Road, Bldg. 1, Suite 110

Austin, TX 78746

Jason Dwain Mazingo

Attorney at The Mazingo Firm, PC

305 South Broadway, Suite 404

Tyler, TX 75702

Tonya M. Gray

Attorney at Andrews Kurth LLP

1717 Main St, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Houston

1301 Mckinney, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77010-3096

John M Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP - Austin

401 Congress Ave, Suite 2500

Austin, TX 78701-3799

Bret Thomas Winterle

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Scott Fuller

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Ryan A Tyz

Attorney at Tyz Marton Schumann LLP

282Nd Street, Floor 3, #3119

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael John Forbes

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP - Houston

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002-6119

Michael Charles Smith

Attorney at Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, LLP-Marshall

P O Box 1556

Marshall, TX 75671-1556

Nick E Williamson

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP - St Louis

211 N Broadway, Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102-3600

David A Roodman

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP - St Louis

211 N Broadway, Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102-3600

James M Sulentic

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - Nebraska

1650 Farnam Street, The Omaha Building

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Other Attorneys

Erica Anne Dorwart

J Daniel Harkins

Attorney at Cox Smith Matthews Incorporated - San Antonio

112 East Pecan Street, Suite 1800

San Antonio, TX 78205

Richard L Schwartz

Attorney at Whitaker Chalk Swindle & Schwartz PLLC

301 Commerce Street, Suite 3500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason Woodard Cook

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP - Dallas

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP - Dallas

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5284530.), filed by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Turn IP LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Turn IP LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Alliance Bank. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Turn IP LLC. Alliance Bank served on 8/20/2015, answer due 9/10/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#7

(#7) Request by Turn IP LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alliance Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance Bank (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1232. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

#150

(#150) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#149

(#149) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/29/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#148

(#148) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss First Republic Bank by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#147

(#147) ORDER granting 146 Motion to Stay of All Deadlines between Turn IP LLC and First Republic Bank. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#146

(#146) Joint MOTION to Stay for Additional 7 Days Pending Settlement by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forbes, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#145

(#145) ORDER granting 144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BOKF NA filed by Turn IP LLC., Bank of Texas (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237), BOKF, NA (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237) and BOKF, NA (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237) terminated., Attorney Erica Anne Dorwart terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#144

(#144) Joint MOTION to Dismiss BOKF NA by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

#143

(#143) ORDER granting 132 MOTION to Dismiss Alliance Bank without prejudice filed by Turn IP LLC., Alliance Bank terminated.,. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/12/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#142

(#142) ORDER granting 139 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association, and U.S. Bancorp Asset Management, Inc. filed by Turn IP LLC., US Bancorp Asset Management Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1256), U.S. Bancorp and U.S. Bancorp National Association terminated., Attorney Tonya M. Gray and Anthony H. Son terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/10/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#150) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#149) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/29/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#148) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss First Republic Bank by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#147) ORDER granting 146 Motion to Stay of All Deadlines between Turn IP LLC and First Republic Bank. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#146) Joint MOTION to Stay for Additional 7 Days Pending Settlement by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forbes, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#145) ORDER granting 144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BOKF NA filed by Turn IP LLC., Bank of Texas (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237), BOKF, NA (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237) and BOKF, NA (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1237) terminated., Attorney Erica Anne Dorwart terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) Joint MOTION to Dismiss BOKF NA by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) ORDER granting 132 MOTION to Dismiss Alliance Bank without prejudice filed by Turn IP LLC., Alliance Bank terminated.,. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/12/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) ORDER granting 139 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association, and U.S. Bancorp Asset Management, Inc. filed by Turn IP LLC., US Bancorp Asset Management Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1256), U.S. Bancorp and U.S. Bancorp National Association terminated., Attorney Tonya M. Gray and Anthony H. Son terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/10/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) ORDER granting 138 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. filed by Turn IP LLC., BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1238) terminated., Attorney Tonya M. Gray terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/10/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lance Johnson on behalf of American Bank of Texas, First Bank & Trust East Texas, PlainsCapital Bank, Southside Bank (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1232. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance Bank (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request by Turn IP LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alliance Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Turn IP LLC. Alliance Bank served on 8/20/2015, answer due 9/10/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Alliance Bank. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Turn IP LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Turn IP LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5284530.), filed by Turn IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.