This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 10:33:35 (UTC).

Tumpowsky v. Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 Tumpowsky filed an Other lawsuit against Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-07210

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Tumpowsky

Defendant

Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan Salvetti

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, Llp

41 Madison Avenue, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Robert L. Lakind

Attorney at Szaferman, Lakind, Blumstein & Blader, P.c.

101 Grovers Mill Road, Suite 200

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Arnold C. Lakind

Attorney at Szaferman, Lakind, Blumstein & Blader, P.c.

101 Grovers Mill Road, Suite 200

Lawrenceville, NJ 08540

Robin F Zwerling

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

41 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Marvin Alan Miller

Attorney at Miller Law LLC

115 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2910

Chicago, IL 60603

Jeffrey C Zwerling

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling LLP

41 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Andrew W. Robertson

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, Llp

41 Madison Avenue, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Daniel S. Sweetser

Attorney at Szaferman, Lakind, Blumstein & Blader, P.c.

101 Grovers Mill Road, Suite 200

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Defendant Attorneys

Paul J. Walsen

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Stephen J. O'Neil

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

John William Rotunno

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Molly K. McGinley

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Nicole Claire Mueller

Attorney at K&l Gates Llp

70 West Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ruth Tumpowsky; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9865934.(Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by John William Rotunno (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by John William Rotunno for presentment of extension of time 6 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/2/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by Stephen J. O'Neil (O'Neil, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by Paul J. Walsen (Walsen, Paul) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9942906. (Sweetser, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9942976. (Lakind, Arnold) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9943019. (Lakind, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9943956. (Zwerling, Robin) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#20

(#20) ORDER: Motion 13 of Jeffrey C. Zwerling for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 14 of Susan Salvetti for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 15 of Andrew W. Robertson for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 16 of Daniel S. Sweetser for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 17 of Arnold C. Lakind for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 18 of Robert L. Lakind for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 19 of Robin F. Zwerling for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/28/2014. Mailed notice (sxw) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#21

(#21) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/4/14.(ea, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Daniel S. Sweetser (Sweetser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#23

(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Robert L. Lakind (Lakind, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#24

(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Arnold C. Lakind (Lakind, Arnold) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Arnold C. Lakind (Lakind, Arnold) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Robert L. Lakind (Lakind, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Daniel S. Sweetser (Sweetser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/4/14.(ea, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: Motion 13 of Jeffrey C. Zwerling for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 14 of Susan Salvetti for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 15 of Andrew W. Robertson for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 16 of Daniel S. Sweetser for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 17 of Arnold C. Lakind for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 18 of Robert L. Lakind for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 19 of Robin F. Zwerling for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/28/2014. Mailed notice (sxw) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9943956. (Zwerling, Robin) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9943019. (Lakind, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9942976. (Lakind, Arnold) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9942906. (Sweetser, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9935880. (Robertson, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by Molly K. McGinley (McGinley, Molly) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by Paul J. Walsen (Walsen, Paul) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by Stephen J. O'Neil (O'Neil, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by John William Rotunno for presentment of extension of time 6 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/2/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc. by John William Rotunno (Rotunno, John) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ruth Tumpowsky by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ruth Tumpowsky; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9865934.(Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.