This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 05:34:35 (UTC).

TSI, Incorporated v. Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 TSI, Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Azbil BioVigilant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-1502

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSI, Incorporated

Defendant

Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/22/2014. [157553]Entry of Appearance due 06/12/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/12/2014. Docketing Statement due 06/12/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/28/2014.

#2

(#2) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) [The Transcript of Proceedings] for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. [159133]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161093]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161096]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161097]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161099]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Daniel Ebenstein as principal counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161102]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Brian A. Comack as of counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161104]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for Timothy E. Grimsrud as principal counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161106]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Mark Berkowitz as of counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161109]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for David J.F. Gross as of counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161110]

#12

(#12) Notice of intent to file corresponding briefs on CD-ROM for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161111]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth Cowan Wright as of counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161112]

#14

(#14) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 07/14/2014 by email. [167277]

#15

(#15) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 07/14/2014 by email. [167308]

#16

(#16) MOTION of Appellant TSI, Incorporated and Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc. to terminate appeal through Dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/16/2014 by email. [168158]

#17

(#17) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [16] filed by Appellant TSI, Incorporated and Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [168221]

#18

(#18) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [168224]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [168224]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [16] filed by Appellant TSI, Incorporated and Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [168221]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION of Appellant TSI, Incorporated and Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc. to terminate appeal through Dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/16/2014 by email. [168158]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 07/14/2014 by email. [167308]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 07/14/2014 by email. [167277]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth Cowan Wright as of counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161112]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of intent to file corresponding briefs on CD-ROM for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161111]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for David J.F. Gross as of counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161110]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Mark Berkowitz as of counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161109]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Timothy E. Grimsrud as principal counsel for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161106]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Brian A. Comack as of counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161104]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Daniel Ebenstein as principal counsel for Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161102]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161099]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/12/2014 by email, US mail. [161097]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161096]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Azbil BioVigilant, Inc.. Service: 06/12/2014 by email. [161093]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) [The Transcript of Proceedings] for Appellant TSI, Incorporated. Service: 06/04/2014 by email. [159133]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/22/2014. [157553]Entry of Appearance due 06/12/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/12/2014. Docketing Statement due 06/12/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/28/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TSI is a litigant