This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:09:15 (UTC).

Tovar v. Luna Car Center, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Tovar filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Luna Car Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00355

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rupert Tovar

Defendants

Luna Car Center, LLC

Sohail Mohammed

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alfonso Kennard, Jr.

Attorney at Kennard, Blankenship & Robinson, P.C.

2603 Augusta Drive, 14Th Floor

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Franz M. von Hoffmann

Attorney at Attorney at Law

512 Second St - Ste 1

Graham, TX 76450

Michael V. Galo, Jr.

Attorney at Galo Law Firm, P.C.

4230 Gardendale, Building 401

San Antonio, TX 78229

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7419567), filed by Rupert Tovar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aej) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Luna Car Center,LLC. (aej) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Franz M. von Hoffmann by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (aej) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#7

(#7) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500030248. (aej) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rupert Tovar. Luna Car Center,LLC served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#9

(#9) Final MOTION to Dismiss by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(von Hoffmann, Franz) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Settlement Joint Advisory by Luna Car Center, LLC, Sohail Mohammed (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#26

(#26) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 9/10/2015 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(aej) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#25

(#25) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Luna Car Center, LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#24

(#24) Defendants' ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed.(Galo, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER Setting Status Conference and Hearing on All Pending Motions, ( Status Conference set for 9/10/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/21/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2015, Discovery due by 1/18/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 9/14/2015, Motions due by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#20

(#20) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

#19

(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Settlement Joint Advisory by Luna Car Center, LLC, Sohail Mohammed (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 9/10/2015 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(aej) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Luna Car Center, LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Defendants' ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed.(Galo, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER Setting Status Conference and Hearing on All Pending Motions, ( Status Conference set for 9/10/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/21/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2015, Discovery due by 1/18/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 9/14/2015, Motions due by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 07/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORIGINAL ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed.(von Hoffmann, Franz) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Final MOTION to Dismiss by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(von Hoffmann, Franz) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rupert Tovar. Luna Car Center,LLC served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500030248. (aej) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Franz M. von Hoffmann by Luna Car Center,LLC, Sohail Mohammed. (aej) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Luna Car Center,LLC. (aej) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aej) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rupert Tovar. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7419567), filed by Rupert Tovar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.