This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:53:18 (UTC).

Touchpoint Communications, LLC v. DentalFone, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2015 Touchpoint Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against DentalFone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge J Richard Creatura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-05240

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge J Richard Creatura

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Touchpoint Communications, LLC

Counter Claimant

DentalFone, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Darian A Stanford

Joseph Curtis Edmondson

Counter Claimant Attorneys

John Goldmark

Mallory S Hein

Wm. Tucker Griffith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-3981578), filed by Touchstone Communications, LLC.(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Touchstone Communications, LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Touchstone Communications, LLC (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) DentalFone, LLC, filed by Touchpoint Communications, LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2015 (GMR). (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant DentalFone, LLC. (GMR) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 6/16/2015. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2015. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/2/2015. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/9/2015 by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#45

(#45) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#46

(#46) ORDER GRANTING ORAL ARGUMENT - by Judge J Richard Creatura. Oral argument set for 1/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in D Courtroom.(SH) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#47

(#47) NOTICE TO PARTIES: Attached copy of email sent to all counsel on 1/6/2016 regarding phone call to chambers. (SH) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#48

(#48) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge J Richard Creatura- Dep Clerk: SHuntington; Pla Counsel: J. Curtis Edmondson, Darian Stanford, also in attendance Mark Hutchinson for Touchpoint and Scott Rennie; Def Counsel: Wm. Tucker Griffith by telephone; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: D; Session #: TAC160114;ORAL ARGUMENT held on 1/14/2016. Argument was held on plaintiff's motions (Dockets 38, 39). Issues were discussed and the Court asked for further briefing. Dentalfone will provide a brief of no more than 10 pages re: subject matter jurisdiction by Thursday, January 21, 2016. TouchPoint's response of no more than 10 pages shall be due by February 1, 2016. Reply, if needed, shall be due by 2/4/2016, and shall be no more than 3 pages. Following the submission of this briefing, the Court will issue its ruling on plaintiffs motions. (SH) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#49

(#49) SUPPLEMENT re 48 In Court Hearing,,, Dentalfone's Supp Brief Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Counter Claimant DentalFone, LLC, Defendant DentalFone, LLC (Goldmark, John) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#50

(#50) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2016)

#51

(#51) REPLY by Defendant DentalFone, LLC to 49 Supplement re Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Goldmark, John) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#52

(#52) ORDER granting 38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Without Prejudice - by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#53

(#53) ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims -- by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims -- by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER granting 38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Without Prejudice - by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) REPLY by Defendant DentalFone, LLC to 49 Supplement re Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Goldmark, John) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) SUPPLEMENT re 48 In Court Hearing,,, Dentalfone's Supp Brief Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Counter Claimant DentalFone, LLC, Defendant DentalFone, LLC (Goldmark, John) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge J Richard Creatura- Dep Clerk: SHuntington; Pla Counsel: J. Curtis Edmondson, Darian Stanford, also in attendance Mark Hutchinson for Touchpoint and Scott Rennie; Def Counsel: Wm. Tucker Griffith by telephone; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: D; Session #: TAC160114;ORAL ARGUMENT held on 1/14/2016. Argument was held on plaintiff's motions (Dockets 38, 39). Issues were discussed and the Court asked for further briefing. Dentalfone will provide a brief of no more than 10 pages re: subject matter jurisdiction by Thursday, January 21, 2016. TouchPoint's response of no more than 10 pages shall be due by February 1, 2016. Reply, if needed, shall be due by 2/4/2016, and shall be no more than 3 pages. Following the submission of this briefing, the Court will issue its ruling on plaintiffs motions. (SH) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE TO PARTIES: Attached copy of email sent to all counsel on 1/6/2016 regarding phone call to chambers. (SH) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER GRANTING ORAL ARGUMENT - by Judge J Richard Creatura. Oral argument set for 1/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in D Courtroom.(SH) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC re 42 Response to Motion, 43 Reply to Response to Motion (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Stipulated MOTION for an extension of time by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/26/2015, (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 05/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2015. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/2/2015. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/9/2015 by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 6/16/2015. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant DentalFone, LLC. (GMR) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) DentalFone, LLC, filed by Touchpoint Communications, LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2015 (GMR). (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Amended CIVIL COVER SHEET and Amended SUMMONS re 2 Civil Cover Sheet, 3 Praecipe for a Summons, filed by Plaintiff Touchpoint Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2015 (GMR). (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Touchstone Communications, LLC (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Touchstone Communications, LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-3981578), filed by Touchstone Communications, LLC.(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less