This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2016 at 01:43:55 (UTC).

TORRES v. CLEANNET U.S.A., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 TORRES filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against CLEANNET U S A , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02818

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDDY TORRES

Defendants

CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.

CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.

CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PITTSBURGH, INC.

MKH SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLES J. KOCHER

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI BARRETT & BENDESKY PC

One Liberty Pl 52Nd Fl, 1650 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PATRICK HOWARD

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI BARRETT & BENDESKY

1650 Market St., 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PETER D. WINEBRAKE

Attorney at WINEBRAKE & SANTILLO, LLC

715 Twining Road

Dresher, PA 19025

SIMON BAHNE PARIS

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI BARRETT & BENDESKY, P.C.

One Liberty Place, 52Nd Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAVID GARCIA-VILLARREAL

Attorney at GARCIA & ASSOCIATES LLC

3 North Second St., 2Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19106

R. ANDREW SANTILLO

Attorney at WINEBRAKE & SANTILLO, LLC

715 Twining Road

Dresher, PA 19025

Defendant Attorneys

MARTHA J. KEON

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

WILLIAM J. SIMMONS

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102-1321

DAVID KRAUT

Attorney at KRAUT HARRIS PC

1767 Sentry Parkway West

Blue Bell, PA 19422

HAROLD M. GOLDNER

Attorney at KRAUT HARRIS, P.C.

1767 Sentry Parkway West

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#31

#32

#33

#34

#35

#36

#37

#38

#39

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER that THE CASE IS NO LONGER STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that:. PLAINTIFF MUST RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS OF DEFENDANT MKH SERVICES, INC., D/B/A CLEANNET PHILADELPHIA (ECF NO. 12) AND THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS CLEANNET U.S.A., INC. AND CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. TO DISMISS OR STAY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PENDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ECF NO. 13) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 18, 2014.. DEFENDANTS MAY REPLY ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 25, 2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/4/2014. 11/4/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (ECF NO. 37) that PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. 19) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/4/2014. 11/4/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/4/2014. 11/4/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/23/2014 Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT. (amas) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) STATUS REPORT (Joint Rule 26(f) Report by CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KEON, MARTHA) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Request for Judicial Notice by CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KEON, MARTHA) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE by EDDY TORRES re 28 Notice (Other) Filing of Transcript Before Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (KOCHER, CHARLES) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SIMON BAHNE PARIS, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/22/2014. 9/22/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SIMON BAHNE PARIS, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, EDDY TORRES. SPONSER STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ($40.00 FILING FEE RECEIVED, RECEIPT #108089) (amas) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER that THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2014 AT 11:0 A.M. IS CANCELED AND RESCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, OCTOBER 23, 2014 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/18/2014. 9/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by HAROLD M. GOLDNER on behalf of MKH SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(GOLDNER, HAROLD) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.. Amendment to 1 Notice of Removal,, Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (KEON, MARTHA) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME UP TO AND INCLUDING 6/2/2014 IN WHICH TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CAPTION OF THIS MATTER IS HEREBY AMENDED TO DELETE "CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PITTSBURGH, INC." AND REPLACE IT WITH CLEANNET SYSTEMS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/21/2014. 5/22/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Copy of Entry of Apperance dated 4/10/14 filed in Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County by DAVID GARCIA-VILLARREAL on behalf of EDDY TORRES. (GARCIA-VILLARREAL, DAVID) Modified on 5/22/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER D. WINEBRAKE on behalf of EDDY TORRES (WINEBRAKE, PETER) (Entered: 05/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION for Extension to File Answer to Complaint and to Correct Caption by MKH SERVICES, INC.. (KRAUT, DAVID) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/20/2014 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA J. KEON on behalf of CLEANNET U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KEON, MARTHA) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED DOCUMENT by CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.. Amendment to 1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit B part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Designation Form, # 7 Case Management Track Form)(SIMMONS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLEANNET U.S.A., INC.(jmv, ) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLEANNET U.S.A., INC. from Court of Common Pleas Phila County, case number 140400901. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE101314); Cert of Serv. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A, # 2 Exh. C)(jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2014: # 3 Exh. B part 1) (jmv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2014: # 4 Exh. B part 2) (jmv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2014: # 5 Exh. B part 3) (jmv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2014: # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2014: # 7 Case Management Track Form, # 8 Designation Form) (jmv, ). (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEANNET USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAROLD M. GOLDNER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martha J. Keon Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Simmons