This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:14:34 (UTC).

Top Tobacco, L.P. et al v. Compuzone, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2015 Top Tobacco, L P filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Compuzone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable John W. Darrah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable John W. Darrah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Top Tobacco, L.P.

Republic Tobacco, L.P.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Compuzone, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Collette Alison Brown

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg

2 North Lasalle, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Andrea Stein Fuelleman

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg Llp

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Antony Joseph McShane

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg

Two North Lasalle Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jami A. Gekas

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Craig S. Fochler

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Richard Spencer Montei

Attorney at Foley & Lardner Llp

321 N Clark St Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Kenneth K Suh

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

500 West Madison, Suite 2450

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Antony Joseph McShane (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Top Tobacco, L.P. (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Republic Tobacco, L.P. (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. of Claims Involving Trademarks Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Andrea Stein Fuelleman (Fuelleman, Andrea) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#8

(#8) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#9

(#9) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (mr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held and continued to 10/8/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel reported on the progress of settlement discussions.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#43

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held. Counsel reported that the parties have reached an agreement in principal to settle the case. Counsel shall file the dismissal order with the district court.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#44

(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held and continued to 10/27/15 at 9:30 a.m. Parties to submit an agreed order by 10/22/15. Settlement reported. Mailed notice (maf) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#45

(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: In light of the reported settlement, all matters relating to the referral of this action have been concluded. The referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned district judge. Judge Honorable Daniel G. Martin no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#46

(#46) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 44 sent to Attorney Kenneth K Suh returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Kenneth K Suh Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#47

(#47) MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McShane, Antony) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#48

(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Agreed motion for entry of a consent judgment 47 is granted. Order to follow. Status hearing set for 10/27/15 is vacated. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#49

(#49) CONSENT Judgment. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/26/2015. Mailed notice.(jl) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#50

(#50) MAILED Trademark closing report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jl) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) MAILED Trademark closing report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jl) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) CONSENT Judgment. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/26/2015. Mailed notice.(jl) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Agreed motion for entry of a consent judgment 47 is granted. Order to follow. Status hearing set for 10/27/15 is vacated. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McShane, Antony) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 44 sent to Attorney Kenneth K Suh returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Kenneth K Suh Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: In light of the reported settlement, all matters relating to the referral of this action have been concluded. The referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned district judge. Judge Honorable Daniel G. Martin no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held and continued to 10/27/15 at 9:30 a.m. Parties to submit an agreed order by 10/22/15. Settlement reported. Mailed notice (maf) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held. Counsel reported that the parties have reached an agreement in principal to settle the case. Counsel shall file the dismissal order with the district court.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held and continued to 10/8/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel reported on the progress of settlement discussions.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 9/22/15 is re-set to 10/14/15 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Compuzone, Inc. by Jami A. Gekas (Gekas, Jami) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (mr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Andrea Stein Fuelleman (Fuelleman, Andrea) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. of Claims Involving Trademarks Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Republic Tobacco, L.P. (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Top Tobacco, L.P. (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Antony Joseph McShane (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Top Tobacco, L.P., Republic Tobacco, L.P.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10246466. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McShane, Antony) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Compuzone, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Top Tobacco, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Republic Tobacco, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antony Joseph McShane(Designation Retained)