This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 14:53:57 (UTC).

Top Rock Construction, Inc. v. Kevcon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Top Rock Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Kevcon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick and Judge Roger T. Benitez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00624

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick

Judge

Judge Roger T. Benitez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Top Rock Construction, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Liberty Mutual Group Inc

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Kevcon Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Edward H. Talmadge

Attorney at Edward H. Talmadge, P.C.

145 S. Holly Street, Suite B

Medford, OR 97501

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Thomas A. Ped

Attorney at Williams Kastner & Gibbs, PLLC

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204-2025

Michael G. Halligan

Attorney at Sussman Shank, LLP

1000 Sw Broadway, Suite 1400

Portland, OR 97205

William L Bruckner

Attorney at Bruckner and Walker

4550 Kearny Villa Road, Suite 209

San Diego, CA 92123

Nicholas Arcamone

Attorney at Bruckner Law Firm, APC

4550 Kearny Villa Road, Suite 209

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3843198 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Owen M. Panner and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/20/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 2/20/2015. Ordered by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons) Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevcon, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed as to Kevcon, Inc. served on 9/29/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/03/2014)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. served on 9/26/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/03/2014)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed as to Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 9/29/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/07/2014)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance of Michael G. Halligan appearing on behalf of Kevcon, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Kevcon, Inc. (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 11/14/2014)

#33

(#33) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/1/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/27/2015.(kcm) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

#32

(#32) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Top Rock Construction, Inc. by Kevcon Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (subcontract))(Arcamone, Nicholas) (kcm). (Entered: 04/24/2015)

#31

(#31) Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick assigned to transfer case from District of Oregon. (no document attached) (kas) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#30

(#30) Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 1:14-cv-01516. Original file received electronically (kas) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#29

(#29) ORDER: Granting Motion to Change or Transfer Venue (Related Doc # 16 ). This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed on 3/17/2015 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#28

(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kevcon, Inc.. (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#27

(#27) Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 16 . Filed by Kevcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#26

(#26) Declaration of Vale Womelsdorf in Response to Motion To Change Venue. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 25 .) (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#25

(#25) Response to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 16 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/1/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/27/2015.(kcm) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Top Rock Construction, Inc. by Kevcon Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (subcontract))(Arcamone, Nicholas) (kcm). (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick assigned to transfer case from District of Oregon. (no document attached) (kas) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 1:14-cv-01516. Original file received electronically (kas) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER: Granting Motion to Change or Transfer Venue (Related Doc # 16 ). This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed on 3/17/2015 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kevcon, Inc.. (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 16 . Filed by Kevcon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Declaration of Vale Womelsdorf in Response to Motion To Change Venue. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 25 .) (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Response to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 16 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER: Granting in Part Denying in Part Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 22 by rescheduling the following dates: Discovery is to be completed by 3/23/2015; Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/21/2015; Pretrial Order is due by 4/21/2015. Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/28/2015 at 10:00AM in Medford by telephone before Judge Owen M. Panner. The parties will be provided with access information for the court's conference line by email. Ordered by Judge Owen M. Panner. (wk) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Arcamone . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3907881. Filed by Kevcon, Inc.. (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance of Michael G. Halligan appearing on behalf of Kevcon, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Kevcon, Inc. (Halligan, Michael) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 11/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed as to Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 9/29/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed as to Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. served on 9/26/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed as to Kevcon, Inc. served on 9/29/2014. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 10/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevcon, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons) Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc.. (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Owen M. Panner and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/20/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 2/20/2015. Ordered by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3843198 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Top Rock Construction, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Talmadge, Edward) [Transferred from Oregon on 3/19/2015.] (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.