This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2016 at 15:27:39 (UTC).

Tolbert, et al v. Monsanto Company, et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2001 Tolbert filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Karon O Bowdre. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:01-CV-01407

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Karon O Bowdre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Detra Murray

Orlando Jackson

Jared S Holder

Tiffany Dean

Shontae Willingham

Shaquilla Elston

Linda J Jacobs

Arthur Welch

Kevin Parson

James Bagley

Aisha Jackson

Sarah E Clopton

Kanisha Almon

Natiyah D Toson

Shantell Porter

Defendants

Monsanto Company

Pfizer, Inc.

Pharamacia Corporation

Solutia, Inc.

Special Master

Special Master

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B Byrne, Jr

Attorney at CAPELL & HOWARD PC

150 South Perry Street, Post Office Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36102-2069

Jere L Beasley

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Jodi L McKelvin

Attorney at SHELBY & RODEN LLC

2956 Rhodes Circle

Birmingham, AL 35205

John E Norris

Attorney at DAVIS & NORRIS LLP

2151 Highland Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Larry A Golston, Jr

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

272 Commerce Street, P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Robert B Roden

Attorney at SHELBY RODEN & CARTEE LLC

2956 Rhodes Circle, 933-8383, Fax: 933-2299 Fax

Birmingham, AL 35205

Scarlett M Tuley

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Scott A Boykin

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Tyler C Vail

Attorney at HOLLIS WRIGHT & COUCH PC

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Josh J Wright

Attorney at HOLLIS WRIGHT & COUCH PC

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin E Clark

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

J Mark White

Attorney at WHITE ARNOLD & DOWD PC

2025 3Rd Avenue North, Suite 600

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jackson R Sharman, III

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jere F White, Jr

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Julia Smeds Roth

Attorney at EYSTER KEY TUBB ROTH MIDDLETON & ADAMS LLP

402 E Moulton Street, Po Box 1607

Decatur, AL 35602

Suzanne Alldredge Fleming

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher Yeilding

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

P O Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201-0306

Other Attorneys

David B Byrne, III

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN CROW METHVIN PORTIS & MILES PC

218 Commerce Street, Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

J Richet Pearson

Po Box 11135

Birmingham, AL 35202

Cleophus Thomas, Jr

1000 Quintard Avenue, Suite 501, Po Box 2363

Anniston, AL 36202

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) REQUEST of plaintiff for service by certified mail filed (w/i body of complaint) (BST) (Entered: 06/01/2001)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Monsanto Company on 6/4/01 filed (BST) (Entered: 06/05/2001)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Solutia, Inc. on 6/4/01 filed (BST) (Entered: 06/05/2001)

#4

(#4) ORDER of recusal filed ( by Judge Edwin L. Nelson ) cm (BST) (Entered: 06/06/2001)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of reassignment Case reassigned to Chief Judge U W. Clemon cm (BST) (Entered: 06/06/2001)

#6

(#6) AMENDED(1st) complaint filed by plas to complaint [1-1]; jury demand filed w/exhs att cs (SWB) (Entered: 06/25/2001)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to complaint by dfts w/appear by atty(s) Suzanne Alldredge Fleming, Jere F White Jr, Adam K Peck, Harlan I Prater IV, William S Cox III, Kevin E Clark filed cs (SWB) (Entered: 06/26/2001)

#8

(#8) ANSWER(Amended) to amended complaint by defendants filed cs (SWB) (Entered: 07/18/2001)

#9

(#9) ORDER unless the parties show cause in writing by 10/4/01 for failure to comply w/ FRCP 26(f) the court shall dismiss this case w/o prej filed ( by Chief Judge U W. Clemon ) cm (DWC) (Entered: 09/24/2001)

#918

(#918) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE DECEMBER 2012 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

#919

(#919) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF DECEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

#920

(#920) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF SEPTEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

#921

(#921) ORDER REGARDING THE 2011 ANNUAL FIDUCIARY ACCOUNTING WITH RESPECT TO THE WEST ANNISTON MEDICAL CLINIC, INC. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/7/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/07/2013)

#922

(#922) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE JANUARY 2013 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/1/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/01/2013)

#923

(#923) ORDER PROVIDING 84 CLAIMANTS THIRTY MORE DAYS TO SUBMIT MISSING FORMS OR BE DISQUALIFIED Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/18/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)

#924

(#924) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF JANUARY 2013 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/21/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)

#925

(#925) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF NOVEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/21/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)

#926

(#926) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE FEBRUARY 2013 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 03/25/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)

911 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#926) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE FEBRUARY 2013 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 03/25/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#925) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF NOVEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/21/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#924) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF JANUARY 2013 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/21/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#923) ORDER PROVIDING 84 CLAIMANTS THIRTY MORE DAYS TO SUBMIT MISSING FORMS OR BE DISQUALIFIED Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/18/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#922) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE JANUARY 2013 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/1/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 03/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#921) ORDER REGARDING THE 2011 ANNUAL FIDUCIARY ACCOUNTING WITH RESPECT TO THE WEST ANNISTON MEDICAL CLINIC, INC. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/7/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/07/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#920) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF SEPTEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#919) ORDER ON PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES AND EXPENSES FOR THE MONTH OF DECEMBER 2012 Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#918) ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE DECEMBER 2012 STATEMENT OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/5/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#917) ORDER Regarding the 2011 Annual Fiduciary Accounting With Respect to the Tolbert Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/22/13. (SAC ) (Entered: 01/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
903 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE by parties to show cause order [9-1] filed cs (DWC) (Entered: 09/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER unless the parties show cause in writing by 10/4/01 for failure to comply w/ FRCP 26(f) the court shall dismiss this case w/o prej filed ( by Chief Judge U W. Clemon ) cm (DWC) (Entered: 09/24/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER(Amended) to amended complaint by defendants filed cs (SWB) (Entered: 07/18/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to complaint by dfts w/appear by atty(s) Suzanne Alldredge Fleming, Jere F White Jr, Adam K Peck, Harlan I Prater IV, William S Cox III, Kevin E Clark filed cs (SWB) (Entered: 06/26/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED(1st) complaint filed by plas to complaint [1-1]; jury demand filed w/exhs att cs (SWB) (Entered: 06/25/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of reassignment Case reassigned to Chief Judge U W. Clemon cm (BST) (Entered: 06/06/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER of recusal filed ( by Judge Edwin L. Nelson ) cm (BST) (Entered: 06/06/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Solutia, Inc. on 6/4/01 filed (BST) (Entered: 06/05/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS and complaint returned executed: upon defendant Monsanto Company on 6/4/01 filed (BST) (Entered: 06/05/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST of plaintiff for service by certified mail filed (w/i body of complaint) (BST) (Entered: 06/01/2001)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLUTIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant

Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Bryson Byrne, III