This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 12:46:26 (UTC).

Timothy L. Strader, Sr. v. PHH Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 Timothy L Strader, Sr filed an Other lawsuit against PHH Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01973

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon

Judge

Judge Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lester L. Hall, Jr.

Timothy L. Strader, Sr.

Defendants

Realogy Services Group LLC

Realogy Services Venture Partner LLC

NE Moves Mortgage LLC

Title Resource Group LLC

Realogy Holdings Corp.

NRT LLC

Realogy Group LLC

PHH Broker Partner Corporation

PHH Mortgage Corporation

PHH Corporation

Realogy Intermediate Holdings LLC

TRG Services Escrow, Inc.

PHH Home Loans LLC

RMR Financial, LLC

West Coast Escrow Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael I Katz

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1750

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Kevin Frank Calcagnie

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Dr

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Mark P Robinson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Wayne R Gross

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1750

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Michael P McMahon

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Sutie 1750

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Daniel S Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Evan Christopher Borges

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1750

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Alan Greenberg

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1750

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy J Wildung

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 South Seventh Street 2200 Wells Fargo Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Calvin L Litsey

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

1990 South Bundy Drive Suite 620

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David L Permut

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

901 New York Avenue Nw 9Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20001

Thomas M Hefferon

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

901 New York Avenue Nw 9Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20001

Steven A Ellis

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 South Figueroa Street 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Joel Allen Schiffman

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

300 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 400

Irvine, CA 92618

David M Souders

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 19Th Street Nw 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Michael Y Kieval

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 19Th Street Nw 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Mitchel Howard Kider

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 - 19Th Street Nw Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16841891 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Michael I Katz added to party Timothy L. Strader, Sr(pty:pla))(Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr, (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening Re: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write (see attached.) Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. Amendment to Summons Request 4 (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants NE Moves Mortgage LLC, NRT LLC, PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Home Loans LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, RMR Financial, LLC, Realogy Group LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., Realogy Intermediate Holdings LLC, Realogy Services Group LLC, Realogy Services Venture Partner LLC, TRG Services Escrow, Inc., Title Resource Group LLC, and West Coast Escrow Company. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#9

(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#66

(#66) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order 60 (ib) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

#65

(#65) ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#64

(#64) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#63

(#63) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: CLASS ACTION & CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ACTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. *See order for deadlines and requirements.* (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#62

(#62) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 46 is granted. If plaintiffs still wish to pursue this action, they are granted until 4/21/2016 to file a Second Amended Complaint. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#61

(#61) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order 60 . The following errors were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. All discovery matters are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge, Alexander F. MacKinnon, pursuant to Judge Olguin's Initial Standing Order. Please comply with Local Rules 5-4.4.1, 5-4.4.2 and 5-4.5 regarding the efiling of documents with proposed orders. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ib) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#60

(#60) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr.(Robinson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#55

(#55) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Y Kieval on behalf of PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, designating Joel A Schiffman as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#54

(#54) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M Souders on behalf of PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, designating Joel A Schiffman as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order 60 (ib) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: CLASS ACTION & CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ACTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. *See order for deadlines and requirements.* (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 46 is granted. If plaintiffs still wish to pursue this action, they are granted until 4/21/2016 to file a Second Amended Complaint. (vdr) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order 60 . The following errors were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. All discovery matters are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge, Alexander F. MacKinnon, pursuant to Judge Olguin's Initial Standing Order. Please comply with Local Rules 5-4.4.1, 5-4.4.2 and 5-4.5 regarding the efiling of documents with proposed orders. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ib) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr.(Robinson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Y Kieval on behalf of PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, designating Joel A Schiffman as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M Souders on behalf of PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, designating Joel A Schiffman as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) APPLICATION for attorney Michael Ya'akov Kieval to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17323539 paid.) filed by Defendant PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schiffman, Joel) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Lester L. Hall, Jr. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Timothy L. Strader, Sr, Lester L. Hall, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Attorney Michael I Katz added to party Lester L. Hall, Jr.(pty:pla))(Katz, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants NE Moves Mortgage LLC, NRT LLC, PHH Broker Partner Corporation, PHH Corporation, PHH Home Loans LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, RMR Financial, LLC, Realogy Group LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., Realogy Intermediate Holdings LLC, Realogy Services Group LLC, Realogy Services Venture Partner LLC, TRG Services Escrow, Inc., Title Resource Group LLC, and West Coast Escrow Company. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. Amendment to Summons Request 4 (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening Re: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write (see attached.) Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr, (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16841891 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Timothy L. Strader, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Michael I Katz added to party Timothy L. Strader, Sr(pty:pla))(Katz, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.