This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 07:58:55 (UTC).

THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC v. PROSOURCE PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2015 THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PROSOURCE PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-02037

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Defendants

PURUS LABS, INC.

JOHN'S LONE STAR DISTRIBUTION, INC.

SUPPLEMENT CENTRAL

NETRITION, INC.

DPS NUTRITION

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KALMAN G MAGYAR

LESLEY MCCALL GROSSBERG

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL IAN MEE

ROBERT M. HANLON

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

14 #10

Text of Proposed Order

14 #9

Exhibit F

#14

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER Of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/25/2016. (eaj) (Entered: 10/25/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AMENDED DOCUMENT by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC. Amendment to #27 Stipulation of Dismissal, #28 Stipulation and Order . (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 10/24/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (km) (Entered: 10/24/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/24/2016. (km) (Entered: 10/24/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 10/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Administratively terminating this action; further Order that Plaintiff may re-open this matter after the reexamination of Patent No. 8,952,046 by the United States Patent and Trademark Office is concluded. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/21/2016. (eaj) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Defendants by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Stay and/or Dismiss the Complaint; Granting Defendants motion to stay with respect to the claims asserted against defendants Vitamin Shoppe, Inc.; Nutrition, Inc.; DPS Nutrition; Supplement Central; Purus Labs, Inc.; and Johns Lone Star Distribution, Inc.; Denying Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint for want of personal jurisdiction over foreign defendants; Orderings that Plaintiff shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to conduct jurisdictional discovery regarding Foreign Defendants; Denying Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/29/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/29/2015. (eaj) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee: as to Andrew Dallman $ 150, receipt number tre060859 (kas, ) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL IAN MEE on behalf of All Defendants (MEE, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The STIPULATION #8 submitted by Daniel Mee on 4/23/2015 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (eaj) Modified on 4/24/2015 (eaj, ). (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION & PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by A1 SUPPLEMENTS, INC., ALL STAR HEALTH, DPS NUTRITION, E-VITAMINS, FITRX.COM, INC, I-SUPPLEMENTS.COM, ILLPUMPYOUUP.COM, JOHN'S LONE STAR DISTRIBUTION, INC., LOCKOUT SUPPLEMENTS, MUSCLE & STRENGTH, LLC, NETRITION, INC., NUTRA HEALTH SUPPLY, PLANETARY NUTRITION, PROSOURCE PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, PURUS LABS, INC., SUPPLEMENT CENTRAL, SUPPLEMENTWAREHOUSE.COM, INC., SUPPZ INC., TF SUPPLEMENTS, VITACOST.COM, VITAMIN SHOPPE, INC., WORLD CLASS NUTRITION. (MEE, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification on behalf of THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC Re #1 Complaint,,. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to A1 SUPPLEMENTS, INC., ALL STAR HEALTH, DPS NUTRITION, E-VITAMINS, FITRX.COM, INC, I-SUPPLEMENTS.COM, ILLPUMPYOUUP.COM, JOHN'S LONE STAR DISTRIBUTION, INC., LOCKOUT SUPPLEMENTS, MUSCLE & STRENGTH, LLC, NETRITION, INC., NUTRA HEALTH SUPPLY, PLANETARY NUTRITION, PROSOURCE PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, PURUS LABS, INC., SUPPLEMENT CENTRAL, SUPPLEMENTWAREHOUSE.COM, INC., SUPPZ INC., TF SUPPLEMENTS, VITACOST.COM, VITAMIN SHOPPE, INC., WORLD CLASS NUTRITION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km, ) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (km, ) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (km, ) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (km, ) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against A1 SUPPLEMENTS, INC., ALL STAR HEALTH, DPS NUTRITION, E-VITAMINS, FITRX.COM, INC, I-SUPPLEMENTS.COM, ILLPUMPYOUUP.COM, JOHN'S LONE STAR DISTRIBUTION, INC., LOCKOUT SUPPLEMENTS, MUSCLE & STRENGTH, LLC, NETRITION, INC., NUTRA HEALTH SUPPLY, PLANETARY NUTRITION, PROSOURCE PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, PURUS LABS, INC., SUPPLEMENT CENTRAL, SUPPLEMENTWAREHOUSE.COM, INC., SUPPZ INC., TF SUPPLEMENTS, VITACOST.COM, VITAMIN SHOPPE, INC., WORLD CLASS NUTRITION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6285327) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THERMOLIFE INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(km, ) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less