This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 06:15:55 (UTC).

Thermolife International, LLC v. APS Nutrition et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2015 Thermolife International, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against APS Nutrition. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00893

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Thermolife International, LLC

Defendants, Counter Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

APS Nutrition

Lockout Supplements

All Star Health

Jared Wheat

Netrition, Inc.

World Class Nutrition

3Rd Party Defendant

Ron Kramer

Special Master

Anthony Askew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr.

Cammi Ryan Jones

Nathaniel L. Dilger

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur W. Leach

Edmund J. Novotny

Cynthia Lynn Parker

Charles Ronald Bridgers

Special Master Attorney

Anthony B. Askew

 

Court Documents

#109

#153

#152

#151

#150

#149

#148

#147

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Blank Summons

1 #5

Ex. - E - Notice Letter

1 #4

Ex. - D - '572 Patent

1 #3

Ex. - C - '288 Patent

1 #2

Ex. - B - '187 Patent

1 #1

Ex. - A - '531 Patent

#1

336 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) ORDER: The Court OVERRULES Defendants' (376) Objections to the R&R and ADOPTS the (375) R&R in case 1:15-cv-00892-ELR as the opinion of this Court. In light of the rulings herein, the Court CANCELS the tentatively scheduled hearing in this matter currently set for Wednesday, April 29, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/28/2020. (Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR) (jap) Modified on 4/28/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) ORDER granting 379 Motion to Amend in case 1:15-cv-00892-ELR. The Court GRANTS the Parties' motion and AMENDS the previously entered scheduling order as follows: Within thirty (30) days of the Court's issuance of its claim construction order, the Parties will meet, confer, and submit a proposed schedule for the remaining deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jed) Modified on 4/9/2020 to edit text (jed). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Tentative Hearing set for 4/29/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1788 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR (jap) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) ORDER granting (377) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:15-cv-00892-ELR. The time within which Plaintiff ThermoLife may file its Response to Defendant Hi-Tech's Objections to Special Master Report and Recommendation is extended by fourteen (14) days, through and including April 14, 2020. Additionally, in the event the Court determines a hearing to be necessary in this matter, the Court tentatively SCHEDULES such hearing to take place on April 29, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1788, United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30303. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR (jap) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) ORDER granting (350) Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may file a memorandum of law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, which is expected to be filed on or before July 19, 2019, not to exceed fifty (50) pages. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 22, 2019 to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, which may also not exceed fifty (50) pages. Defendants shall have up to and including September 16, 2019 to file a reply brief in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jpa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) ORDER granting (348) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:15-cv-00892-ELR. Defendants' opposition to the Motion to Stay shall be filed on or before Monday, July 15, 2019. Plaintiff's reply in support of the Motion to Stay shall be filed on or before Monday, July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/8/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jpa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) ORDER granting (329) Motion for Extension of Time through 4/1/19 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Ron Kramer's Motion to Dismiss; granting (329) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:15-cv-00892-ELR. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/13/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jpa) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR (cmd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jpa) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) ORDER governing the scope and duties of the Special Master. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Upon the Special Master's filing of any Report & Recommendation, the parties shall move to reopen this case. The Court further ORDERS that objections to the Special Master's Report(s) & Recommendation(s) shall be due within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the filing of a Report & Recommendation. Responses shall be due FOURTEEN (14) DAYS after the filing of any objections. Any filing must be in accordance with this Court's Local Rules and with the Undersigned's instructions. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/10/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00892-ELR, 1:15-cv-00893-ELR, 1:15-cv-00894-ELR(jpa) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Of Filing by Thermolife International, LLC Summons as to All Star Health (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Filing by Thermolife International, LLC Summons as to World Class Nutrition (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing by Thermolife International, LLC Summons as to Jared Wheat (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Of Filing by Thermolife International, LLC Summons as to APS Nutrition (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. APPROVED by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mdy) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermolife International, LLC. (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Paul Grier on behalf of Thermolife International, LLC (Grier, Jason) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/31/2015. (mdy) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner - Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (eop) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Thermolife International, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5739596.) (Attachments: #1 Ex. - A - '531 Patent, #2 Ex. - B - '187 Patent, #3 Ex. - C - '288 Patent, #4 Ex. - D - '572 Patent, #5 Ex. - E - Notice Letter, #6 Blank Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less